EP4208687 - COMBUSTIBLE CARTRIDGE CASE FOR AMMUNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNDS Ammo France 13 Route de la Minière 78000 Versailles / FR | [2024/21] |
Former [2023/28] | For all designated states Nexter Munitions 13 Route de la Minière 78034 Versailles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORSAT, Guillaume 18023 Bourges / FR | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21782812.8 | 26.08.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021IB57831 | Priority number, date | FR20200008811 | 01.09.2020 Original published format: FR 2008811 | [2023/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022049465 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4208687 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F42B5/18 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
F42B5/181 (EP,IL,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | VERBRENNBARER PATRONENHÜLSE FÜR MUNITION | [2023/28] | English: | COMBUSTIBLE CARTRIDGE CASE FOR AMMUNITION | [2023/28] | French: | DOUILLE COMBUSTIBLE POUR MUNITION | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 30.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1499078 (RHEINMETALL GMBH) [A] 1,2* figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0248978 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,7 * figure 9; claim 1 *; | [YA]DE19849824 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * figures 1,2,4; claim 1 * [A] 1,5; | [XDYI]EP1092939 (GIAT IND SA [FR]) [XD] 1,2,4,6 * figures 5,7; claim 1 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 3,4 | by applicant | FR2215603 | EP0307307 | EP1092939 |