EP4030421 - METHOD FOR CONVERTING VOICE FEATURE OF VOICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINDS LAB INC. Rm.307, 96, Gajeongbuk-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34111 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states MINDS LAB INC. Rm.307, 96, Gajeongbuk-ro Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 34111 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Hong Seop Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16859 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Seung Won Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 16857 / KR | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Loyer & Abello 9, rue Anatole de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 21783381.3 | 03.08.2021 | [2022/29] | WO2021KR10116 | Priority number, date | KR20200154581 | 18.11.2020 Original published format: KR 20200154581 | [2022/29] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022108040 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030421 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/007, G10L13/033, G10L13/08, G10L13/02, G10L13/047, G10L15/26, G10L15/06, G10L15/04, G06N3/08, G06N3/044, G06N3/045, G06N3/084 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G10L21/007 (EP);
G10L21/013 (US);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/084 (EP);
G10L13/02 (EP);
G10L25/30 (US);
G10L13/033 (EP);
G10L13/047 (EP);
G10L13/08 (EP);
G10L15/26 (EP);
G10L2021/0135 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | G10L13/033, G10L13/08, G10L15/26, G10L15/06, G10L15/04, G06N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG DER SPRACHMERKMALE VON SPRACHE | [2022/29] | English: | METHOD FOR CONVERTING VOICE FEATURE OF VOICE | [2022/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION D'UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE VOCALE DE LA VOIX | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2021 | Translation filed | 15.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 10.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/23] | 01.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019385628 (NAKASHIKA TORU [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0003] , [0039] - [0054] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2020082806 (KIM TAESU [KR], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0041] , [0066] - [0075] - [0078] ** figures 8, 10 *; | [A] - TAKASHI NOSE ET AL, "Speaker-independent HMM-based voice conversion using adaptive quantization of the fundamental frequency", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS , AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 53, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.SPECOM.2011.05.001, ISSN 0167-6393, (20110502), pages 973 - 985, (20110510), XP028378127 [A] 1-5 * section 3.4 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.specom.2011.05.001 | International search | [A]JP2008058696 (NARA INST SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, et al); | [Y]KR101666930B (UNIV SEOUL NAT R & DB FOUND [KR]); | [A]US2018342256 (HUFFMAN WILLIAM CARTER [US], et al); |