Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
02.02.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
19.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
06.10.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.06.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
09.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
09.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
17.06.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
17.06.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
15.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.05.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
25.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.10.2021 | Change - representative | |
16.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |