Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022157329 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200154581 | 18.11.2020 | WO2021KR10116 | 03.08.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4030421 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2023 | A4 | EP4030421 | 20.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200154581 | 18.11.2020 | WO2021KR10116 | 03.08.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022108040 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200154581 | 18.11.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220067864 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200154581 | 18.11.2020 |