EP4204014 - RECOMBINANT ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS FOR TREATMENT OF GRN-ASSOCIATED ADULT-ONSET NEURODEGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3600 Civic Center Boulevard, 9th Floor Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, James, M. Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 02 /
HINDERER, Christian New Orleans, LA 70115 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Nimrod Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21783625.3 | 26.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021US47686 | Priority number, date | US202063070639P | 26.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063070639 P | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022046988 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4204014 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, A61P25/28, A61K38/18, C07K14/475 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A61K48/005 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K48/0016 (KR);
A61K38/18 (US);
A61K48/0075 (EP,IL,US);
A61K48/0083 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/475 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,IL);
A01K2227/105 (EP,IL);
A01K2267/0318 (EP,IL);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTES ADENO-ASSOZIIERTES VIRUS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERNEUERUNGSENTWICKLUNG BEI ERWACHSENEN | [2023/27] | English: | RECOMBINANT ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS FOR TREATMENT OF GRN-ASSOCIATED ADULT-ONSET NEURODEGENERATION | [2023/27] | French: | VIRUS ADÉNO-ASSOCIÉ RECOMBINANT POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE NEURODÉGÉNÉRESCENCE D'APPARITION TARDIVE CHEZ L'ADULTE ASSOCIÉE À GRN | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 20.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2017136500 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]) [Y] 1-39 * page 34, line 15 - page 36, line 15 * * examples 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2017151884 (THE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF PHILADELPHIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-39 * the whole document * * in particular §13, §127-§129 *; | [XP]WO2020172490 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]) [XP] 1-39 * the whole document ** in particular examples 5-7 and claims *; | [X] - ANDREW E. ARRANT ET AL, "Restoring neuronal progranulin reverses deficits in a mouse model of frontotemporal dementia", BRAIN, GB, (20170329), vol. 140, no. 5, doi:10.1093/brain/awx060, ISSN 0006-8950, pages 1447 - 1465, XP055601864 [X] 1,10,11,14,18 * page 1449, column l, paragraphs 2-3 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/brain/awx060 | [XPI] - HINDERER CHRISTIAN ET AL, "Adeno-associated virus serotype 1-based gene therapy for FTD caused by GRN mutations", ANNALS OF CLINICAL AND TRANSLATIONAL NEUROLOGY, GB, vol. 7, no. 10, doi:10.1002/acn3.51165, ISSN 2328-9503, (20200916), pages 1843 - 1853, URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/full-xml/10.1002/acn3.51165, XP055867973 [XP] 1-4,7-17 * the whole document * * in particular figure 3 * [I] 5,6,18-39 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/acn3.51165 | by applicant | US5139941 | US5741683 | US6057152 | US6204059 | US6268213 | US6491907 | WO03042397 | US6660514 | US6759237 | WO2005033321 | US6951753 | US7094604 | US7105345 | WO2006110689 | US7172893 | US7186552 | US7201898 | US7229823 | US7439065 | US7588772 | WO2011126808 | WO2013004943 | US2013045186 | US8637255 | US9567607 | WO2017100704 | WO2017100676 | WO2017100674 | WO2017160360 | WO2018160582 | - COYLE-GILCHRIST IT et al., Neurology, (20160000), vol. 86, no. 18, pages 1736 - 43 | - ROHRER JD et al., Neurology, (20090000), vol. 73, no. 18, pages 1451 - 6 | - LE BER I et al., Brain: a journal of neurology, (20080000), vol. 131, no. 3, pages 732 - 46 | - GASS J et al., Human molecular genetics, (20060000), vol. 15, no. 20, pages 2988 - 3001 | - SMITH KATHERINE R et al., American Journal of Human Genetics, (20120000), vol. 90, no. 6, pages 1102 - 7 | - WARD ME et al., Science Translational Medicine, (20170000), vol. 9, no. 385 | - GOTZL JK et al., Acta neuropathologica, (20140000), vol. 127, no. 6, pages 845 - 60 | - BEEL S et al., Human molecular genetics, (20170801), vol. 26, no. 15, pages 2850 - 2863 | - TANAKA Y et al., Human molecular genetics, (20170000), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 969 - 88 | - SIINTOLA E et al., Brain: a journal of neurology, (20060000), vol. 129, pages 1438 - 45 | - TSAIBOXER, J Neurochem, (20160000), vol. 1, pages 211 - 21 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NP _002078 | - B. J. CARTER, Handbook of Parvoviruses, CRC Press, (19900000), pages 155 - 168 | - SAMBROOK et al., Molecular Cloning. A Laboratory Manua, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory, (19890000), pages 520 - 532 | - K. FISHER et al., J. Virol., (19960000), vol. 70 | - MA ZANTA-BOUSSIF et al., Gene Therapy, (20090000), vol. 16, pages 605 - 619 | - GRIEGERSAMULSKI, "Adeno-associated virus as a gene therapy vector: Vector development, production and clinical applications", Adv. Biochem. Engin/Biotechnol., (20050000), vol. 99, pages 119 - 145, XP009125595 | - BUNING, "Recent developments in adeno-associated virus vector technology", J. Gene Med., (20080000), vol. 10, pages 717 - 733 | - WILS H et al., The Journal of Pathology, (20120000), vol. 228, no. 1, pages 67 - 76 | - GAO et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20030000), vol. 100, no. 10, pages 6081 - 6086 | - ZHANG et al., "Adenovirus-adeno-associated virus hybrid for large-scale recombinant adeno-associated virus production", Human Gene Therapy, (20090000), vol. 20, pages 922 - 929 | - GRIMM et al., Gene Therapy, (19990000), vol. 6, pages 1322 - 1330 | - SOMMER et al., Molec. Ther., (20030000), vol. 7, pages 122 - 128 | - WOBUS et al., J. Virol., (20000000), vol. 74, pages 9281 - 9293 | - M. LOCK et al., Hu Gene Therapy Methods, Hum Gene Ther Methods, (20140214), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 115 - 25 | - GORNO-TEMPINI et al., "Classification of primary progressive aphasia and its variants", Neurology, (20110000), vol. 76, no. 11, pages 1006 - 14 | - J. D. THOMSON et al., "A comprehensive comparison of multiple sequence alignments", Nucl. Acids. Res., (19990000), vol. 27, no. 13, pages 2682 - 2690 | - LOCK M et al., Hum Gene Ther., (20100000), vol. 21, no. 10, pages 1259 - 71 | - CALCEDO R et al., J Infect Dis, (20090000), vol. 199, no. 3, pages 381 - 90 | - XIAO et al., "Gene therapy vectors based on adeno-associated virus type 1", J Virol, (19990000), vol. 73, no. 5, pages 3994 - 4003 | - LOCK et al., "Absolute determination of single-stranded and self-complementary adeno-associated viral vector genome titers by droplet digital PCR", Hum Gene Ther Methods, (20140000), vol. 25, no. 2, doi:10.1089/hgtb.2013.131, pages 115 - 25, XP055653721 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hgtb.2013.131 | - LUI H et al., Cell, (20160000), vol. 165, no. 4, pages 921 - 35 | - WARD ME et al., "9", Sci Transl Med., (20170412), no. 385, page eaah5642 | - AHMED Z et al., Am J Pathol, (20100000), vol. 177, no. 1, pages 311 - 24 | - GHOSHAL N et al., Neurobiology of Disease, (20120000), vol. 45, no. 1, pages 395 - 408 | - FILIANO AJ et al., Journal of neuroscience : the official journal of the Society for Neuroscience, (20130000), vol. 33, no. 12, pages 5352 - 61 | - YIN F et al., FASEB Journal, (20100000), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 4639 - 47 | - WILS H et al., Journal of Pathology, (20120000), vol. 228, no. 1, pages 67 - 76 | - HINDERER C et al., Molecular therapy : the journal of the American Society of Gene Therapy, (20140000), vol. 22, no. 12, pages 2018 - 27 | - GURDA BL et al., Molecular therapy : the journal of the American Society of Gene Therapy, (20160000), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 206 - 16 | - KARAGEORGOS LE et al., Experimental Cell Research, (19970000), vol. 234, no. 1, pages 85 - 97 | - KLEIN ZA et al., Neuron, (20170000), vol. 95, no. 2, pages 281 - 96 | - MEETER LH et al., Dement Geriatr Cogn Dis Extra, (20160000), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 330 - 40 | - AHMED Z et al., "Journal of neuroinflammation", J Neuroinflammation, (20070211), vol. 4, page 7 | WO2016US65970 | WO2016US65976 | WO2016US66013 | WO2016US65974 | WO2019US67872 | WO2020US19149 |