EP4134388 - CONDUCTIVE POLYMER COMPOSITION, SUBSTRATE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-1, Marunouchi 1 chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000005 / JP | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGASAWA, Takayuki c/o New Functional Materials Research Center, SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD., 28-1, Nishi- Fukushima, Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata 942-8601 / JP | 02 /
HATAKEYAMA, Jun c/o New Functional Materials Research Center, SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD., 28-1, Nishi- Fukushima, Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata 942-8601 / JP | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/07] | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21783683.2 | 24.03.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021JP12125 | Priority number, date | JP20200068624 | 06.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020068624 | [2023/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205873 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4134388 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/12, C08G73/02, C08F212/14, C08F220/22, C08F220/38, C08L25/18, C08L33/14, C08L65/00, C08L101/12, H01B1/12, H01B1/20, H01B5/14, C08F220/24, C09D125/18 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
C08F212/24 (EP,US);
C08L65/00 (EP,KR);
C09D5/24 (US);
C08F212/14 (KR);
C08F212/20 (EP);
C08F212/30 (EP,US);
C08F220/22 (KR);
C08F220/24 (EP);
C08F220/38 (KR);
C08F220/382 (US);
C08G61/12 (EP,KR);
C08G61/126 (EP);
C08G73/02 (KR);
C08K5/175 (US);
C08L101/12 (EP,KR);
C08L25/18 (EP,KR);
C08L33/14 (KR);
C09D11/033 (US);
C09D11/107 (US);
C09D11/38 (US);
C09D11/52 (US);
C09D125/18 (EP,US);
C09D133/16 (US);
C09D7/20 (US);
C09D7/45 (US);
C09D7/63 (US);
H01B1/12 (EP,KR);
H10K71/135 (US);
H10K85/113 (US);
H10K85/141 (US);
H10K85/151 (US);
C08G2261/3223 (EP);
C08G2261/794 (EP);
C08G2261/95 (EP);
C11D2111/12 (KR);
H10K50/17 (US);
Y02E10/549 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F212/20, C08F220/382 (EP);
C08F212/24, C08F220/382 (EP);
C08F212/30, C08F212/24 (EP);
C08F220/24, C08F212/24 (EP); |
Former IPC [2023/07] | C08G61/12, C08G73/02, C08F212/14, C08F220/22, C08F220/38, C08L25/18, C08L33/14, C08L65/00, C08L101/12, H01B1/12, H01B1/20, H01B5/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | LEITFÄHIGE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG, SUBSTRAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES SUBSTRATS | [2023/07] | English: | CONDUCTIVE POLYMER COMPOSITION, SUBSTRATE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUBSTRATE | [2023/07] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE CONDUCTRICE, SUBSTRAT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE SUBSTRAT | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2022 | Translation filed | 04.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 17.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2015340118 (NAGASAWA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2016091792 (NAGASAWA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]US2017058144 (HATAKEYAMA JUN [JP], et al); | [Y]US2017090286 (NAGASAWA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2019180888 (NAGASAWA TAKAYUKI [JP]) | International search | [Y]JP2016069636 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 10, 11; | [XY]JP2016188350 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-9, 12-16 * [0011], [0080]-[0086], * [Y] 1-16; | [Y]JP2017061631 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 10, 11 * [0022]-[0024], [0103]-[0109] *; | [Y]JP2019099766 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-16 * [0093]-[0097], [0120], *; | [PA]JP2020128472 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO)[PA] 1-16 | by applicant | JPH0150666B | WO03048228 | EP1373356 | JP2005068166 | JP2008146913 | JP2008546899 | JP6483518B |