Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
29.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
29.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.06.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
09.06.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] |
17.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.01.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
13.01.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
19.12.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.10.2022 | Change - representative | |
04.10.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.11.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
16.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.10.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |