Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023159766 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020068624 | 06.04.2020 | WO2021JP12125 | 24.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220164714 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020068624 | 06.04.2020 | WO2021JP12125 | 24.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7488887B | Global Dossier | 22.05.2024 | B2 | JPWO2021205873 | 14.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020068624 | 06.04.2020 | WO2021JP12125 | 24.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024050695 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2022514384 | 24.03.2021 | JP2020068624 | 06.04.2020 | WO2021JP12125 | 24.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115397916 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020068624 | 06.04.2020 | WO2021JP12125 | 24.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4134388 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2024 | A4 | EP4134388 | 15.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020068624 | 06.04.2020 | WO2021JP12125 | 24.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021205873 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020068624 | 06.04.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202146593 | 16.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020068624 | 06.04.2020 |