EP4053143 - BILE ACID DERIVATIVE SALT, CRYSTAL STRUCTURE THEREOF, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xi'an Biocare Pharma Ltd. No. 02, Building 1, Wanfu Garden Wangsi Street Fengdong New City Xi'an, Shaanxi 710116 / CN | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Guoqin Xietong Innovation Harbour Fengdong, Xi' xian New Area Xi'an, Shaanxi 710086 / CN | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 21783953.9 | 07.04.2021 | [2022/36] | WO2021CN85785 | Priority number, date | CN202010272501 | 08.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010272501 | [2022/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021204142 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053143 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07J51/00, A61K31/675, A61P1/16, A61P3/06, A61P9/12 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
A61P1/16 (EP,CN,KR);
C07J51/00 (EP,CN,KR);
C07J43/003 (US);
A61K31/675 (EP,KR);
A61P3/06 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P9/12 (EP,CN);
C07B2200/13 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | C07J51/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | GALLENSÄUREDERIVATSALZ, KRISTALLSTRUKTUR DAVON, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2022/36] | English: | BILE ACID DERIVATIVE SALT, CRYSTAL STRUCTURE THEREOF, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND USE THEREOF | [2022/36] | French: | SEL DE DÉRIVÉ D'ACIDE BILIAIRE, STRUCTURE CRISTALLINE DE CELUI-CI, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILISATION | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2022 | Translation filed | 26.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 07.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2019119832 (XI AN BIOCARE PHARMA LTD [CN]); | [IP]EP3730509 (XI AN BIOCARE PHARMA [CN]) | International search | [A]CN104672290 (BEIJING PRELUDE PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [A]WO2016045480 (UNITRIS BIOPHARMA CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2016086115 (ENANTA PHARM INC [US]); | [A]WO2016173524 (CHIA TAI TIANQING PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO LTD [CN], et al); | [X]WO2019119832 (XI AN BIOCARE PHARMA LTD [CN]) |