EP4132561 - METHODS OF TREATING CONDITIONS CHARACTERIZED BY INSULIN DEFICIENCY IN ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoffman Technologies LLC 750 Lexington Avenue 9th Floor, Suite 07-103 New York, New York 10022 / US | [2023/40] |
Former [2023/07] | For all designated states Hoffman Technologies LLC. 400 Madison Avenue, Suite 11A New York, NY 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMAN, Steven 15 Knichel Road Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | 02 /
ROTHMAN, John 77 Bissell Road Lebanon, NJ 08833 / US | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21784501.5 | 08.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021US26370 | Priority number, date | US202063006956P | 08.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063006956 P | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021207487 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132561 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/28, A61K9/06, A61K47/10, A61K47/14, A61K47/34, A61K47/18, A61P3/10 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (US);
A61K47/14 (US);
A61K47/18 (US);
A61K47/186 (US);
A61K47/22 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/28, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | A61K38/28, A61K47/34, A61K47/18, A61K9/70, A61P3/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN, DIE DURCH INSULINMANGEL BEI TIEREN GEKENNZEICHNET SIND | [2023/07] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING CONDITIONS CHARACTERIZED BY INSULIN DEFICIENCY IN ANIMALS | [2023/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'ÉTATS CARACTÉRISÉS PAR UNE DÉFICIENCE EN INSULINE CHEZ DES ANIMAUX | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 22.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2016105530 (HOFFMAN STEVEN [US]); | International search | [Y]US5929055 (RYAN MARIA EMANUEL [US], et al) [Y] 2-11 * ; col 1 In 27-31; col 5 In 51; col 7 In 24; col 9 In 33-36; col 14 In 42; col 15 In 3-4 *; | [XY]US2016199453 (HOFFMAN STEVEN [US]) [X] 1 * ; para [0014]-[0020], [0031]-[0036], [0044], [0046], [0053], [0058], [0065], [0067], [0079]-[0080] * [Y] 2-11; | [A]WO2019055747 (TYME INC [US]) [A] 1-11* ; see entire document * |