EP4135320 - POINT CLOUD DATA TRANSMISSION DEVICE, POINT CLOUD DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, POINT CLOUD DATA RECEPTION DEVICE AND POINT CLOUD DATA RECEPTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Sejin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/07] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21784606.2 | 26.03.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021KR03755 | Priority number, date | US202063008735P | 11.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063008735 P | [2023/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021206333 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135320 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/194, H04N13/172, H04N13/161, H04N21/236, H04N21/2343, H04N21/4402, H04N21/434, H04N21/81, H04N19/597, H04N19/70, H04N21/854, // G06T9/00 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
G06T9/001 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (CN);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L65/61 (EP);
H04L65/75 (US);
H04L65/762 (EP);
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (CN);
H04N13/172 (CN);
H04N19/597 (EP);
H04N19/70 (EP);
H04N21/2343 (CN);
H04N21/2362 (CN);
H04N21/434 (CN);
H04N21/4402 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | H04N13/194, H04N13/172, H04N13/161, H04N21/236, H04N21/2343, H04N21/4402, H04N21/434, H04N21/81 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | PUNKTWOLKENDATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PUNKTWOLKENDATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, PUNKTWOLKENDATENEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND PUNKTWOLKENDATENEMPFANGSVERFAHREN | [2023/07] | English: | POINT CLOUD DATA TRANSMISSION DEVICE, POINT CLOUD DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, POINT CLOUD DATA RECEPTION DEVICE AND POINT CLOUD DATA RECEPTION METHOD | [2023/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION DE DONNÉES DE NUAGE DE POINTS, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE DONNÉES DE NUAGE DE POINTS | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2022 | Translation filed | 07.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019087979 (MAMMOU KHALED [CA], et al); | [XYA]WO2019079032 (INTERDIGITAL VC HOLDINGS INC [US]); | [Y]KR20190122867 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]WO2020005365 (FUTUREWEI TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]KR20200006918 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) |