EP4132589 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR BLOOD-BRAIN BARRIER DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aliada Therapeutics, Inc. 200 Berkeley Street, 23rd Floor Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDAVETTAL, Suzanne 941 W Hawthorn APT 5 San Diego, California 92101 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Sanjaya 1400 McKean Road PO Box 776 Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 03 /
DOMINGO, Derrick 3210 Merryfield Row San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
WILKINSON, Deepti 13660 Mango Drive Del Mar, California 92014 / US | 05 /
CEJUDO-MARTIN, Pilar 3210 Merryfield Row San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
JAIPRASART, Pharavee 1400 McKean Road PO Box 776 Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 07 /
GEIST, Brian 1400 McKean Road PO Box 776 Spring House, Pennsylvania 19477 / US | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21784702.9 | 07.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021IB52889 | Priority number, date | US202063006998P | 08.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063006998 P | US202063036020P | 08.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063036020 P | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021205358 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132589 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, C07K16/28, A61K39/00, A61P25/28 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
C07K16/2881 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
A61K39/39533 (US);
A61K47/6849 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N15/62 (US);
C12N15/63 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/31 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/569 (KR);
C07K2317/622 (EP,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | A61K47/68, C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Extension states | BA | 07.11.2022 | ME | 07.11.2022 | Validation states | KH | 07.11.2022 | MA | 07.11.2022 | MD | 07.11.2022 | TN | 07.11.2022 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE DER BLUT-HIRN-SCHRANKE | [2023/07] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR BLOOD-BRAIN BARRIER DELIVERY | [2023/07] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES D'ADMINISTRATION À LA BARRIÈRE HÉMATO-ENCÉPHALIQUE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 26.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014189973 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2019089395 (OSSIANIX INC [US]); | [XI]US2020055931 (DENGL STEFAN [DE], et al) | International search | [A]US2006140960 (WANG YAN [US], et al) [A] 1-3* entire document *; | [A]US2014212423 (HANZATIAN DENISE KARAOGLU [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * entire document *; | [A]US2019111150 (SINGH SHWETA [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * entire document *; | [A]US2019202927 (SAGERT JASON GARY [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * entire document *; | [A]US2019382500 (ABUJOUB AIDA [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * entire document *; | [A]US2020010555 (ORENTAS RIMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * entire document *; | [X]US2020055931 (DENGL STEFAN [DE], et al) [X] 1, 2 * entire document * |