EP4135148 - CHARGING CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM AND CLEANING ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Roborock Technology Co., Ltd. Floor 6, Suite 6016, 6017, 6018, Building C Kangjianbaosheng Square No. 8, Heiquan Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Xinyu c/o Beijing Roborock Technology Co., Ltd. Floor 6, Suite 6016, 6017 6018, Building C Kangjianbaosheng Square No. 8, Heiquan Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21784717.7 | 11.01.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021CN71077 | Priority number, date | CN202010266733 | 07.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010266733 | [2023/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021203789 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135148 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, A47L9/28, A47L11/40 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
A47L9/2873 (EP,US);
H02J7/00036 (CN);
A47L11/4011 (EP);
A47L9/2805 (EP);
H02J7/00045 (CN);
H02J7/0036 (CN,US);
H02J7/0044 (US);
H02J7/0045 (CN);
H02J7/0047 (CN);
A47L2201/022 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | LADESTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE SPEICHERMEDIUM UND REINIGUNGSROBOTER | [2023/07] | English: | CHARGING CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM AND CLEANING ROBOT | [2023/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE ET ROBOT DE NETTOYAGE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2022 | Translation filed | 30.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2013221908 (TANG JINJU [CN]); | [A]JP2017064066 (SHARP KK) | International search | [A]JP2006034432 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-14* entire document *; | [X]CN102407522 (TEK ELECTRICAL SUZHOU CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * description, paragraphs 4-49, and figures 1-9 *; | [X]CN206840109U (ZHANGZHOU MEIZU IND DESIGN CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * description, paragraphs 3-15, and figures 1-2 *; | [A]CN108011253 (SHUAI JINGXIAN) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [PX]CN111446757 (BEIJING ROBOROCK TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-14 * entire document * |