EP4115820 - LAPAROSCOPIC STAPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RootLoc Co., Ltd. B-2307-2310, 23F, 70, Dusan-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08584 / KR | [2023/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Yoo Min 202dong 613ho, 6, Mullae-ro 4-gil, Yeongdeungpo- gu Seoul 07283 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Won Chul 202dong 613ho, 6, Mullae-ro 4-gil, Yeongdeungpo- gu Seoul 07283 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Yoo Heun 202dong 613ho, 6, Mullae-ro 4-gil, Yeongdeungpo- gu Seoul 07283 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Soon Seok F3, 5, Gukgasandanseo-ro 71-gil, Guji-myeon Dalseong-gun, Daegu 43011 / KR | [2023/02] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/02] | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21785185.6 | 31.03.2021 | [2023/02] | WO2021KR03964 | Priority number, date | KR20200042760 | 08.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200042760 | [2023/02] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021206353 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4115820 | Date: | 11.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/068, A61B17/115, A61B17/04, A61B17/00 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP);
A61B17/068 (KR,US);
A61B17/00234 (KR,US);
A61B17/0469 (KR);
A61B17/07207 (US);
A61B17/115 (KR);
B65C7/005 (US);
A61B17/072 (US);
A61B2017/00017 (EP);
A61B2017/00367 (KR);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/0042 (KR,US);
A61B2017/0409 (EP);
A61B2017/0419 (EP);
A61B2017/07214 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/02] | Title | German: | LAPAROSKOPISCHES KLAMMERGERÄT | [2023/02] | English: | LAPAROSCOPIC STAPLER | [2023/02] | French: | AGRAFEUSE LAPAROSCOPIQUE | [2023/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2022 | Translation filed | 05.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/02] | 11.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2008033456 (CATANESE JOSEPH III [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2001354218 (M I T INTERNATL KK, et al); | [A]JP2008188425 (TYCO HEALTHCARE); | [XA]KR101407090B (LEE WON CHEOL [KR]); | [A]JP2016540619 ; | [A]KR20180099146 (LEE WON CHEOL [KR]) |