EP4132929 - NOVEL NATURE-INSPIRED ANTICANCER AND ANTIBACTERIAL MOTIFS AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Sharjah C/o Mohammed Al Hemairy P.O. Box 27272 Sharjah, 27272 / AE | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTEL, Taleb H. c/o University of Sharjah P.O. Box 27272 Sharjah / AE | 02 /
SRINIVASULU, Vunnam c/o University of Sharjah P.O. Box 27272 Sharjah / AE | 03 /
HAMAD, Mawieh c/o University of Sharjah P.O. Box 27272 Sharjah / AE | 04 /
OMAR, Hany c/o University of Sharjah P.O. Box 27272 Sharjah / AE | 05 /
ABDIN, Shiffa c/o University of Sharjah P.O. Box 27272 Sharjah / AE | 06 /
ALI, Amjad c/o University of Sharjah P.O. Box 27272 Sharjah / AE | 07 /
AL-MARZOOQ, Farah Ibrahim c/o University of Sharjah P.O. Box 27272 Sharjah / AE | 08 /
HAMAD, Mohamad c/o University of Sharjah P.O. Box 27272 Sharjah / AE | 09 /
ABU YOUSEF, Imad c/o American University of Sharjah P.O. Box 26666 Sharjah / AE | 10 /
MAJDALAWIEH, Amin c/o American University of Sharjah P.O. Box 26666 Sharjah / AE | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 21785709.3 | 07.04.2021 | [2023/07] | WO2021IB52885 | Priority number, date | US202016842263 | 07.04.2020 Original published format: US202016842263 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021205354 | Date: | 14.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4132929 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/16, A61P31/04, A61P35/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07D471/16 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/07] | C07D471/16, C07D487/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE NATURINSPIRIERTE ANTIKREBS- UND ANTIBAKTERIELLE MOTIVE UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DARAUS | [2023/07] | English: | NOVEL NATURE-INSPIRED ANTICANCER AND ANTIBACTERIAL MOTIFS AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION THEREOF | [2023/07] | French: | NOUVEAUX MOTIFS ANTICANCÉREUX ET ANTIBACTÉRIENS INSPIRÉS DE LA NATURE ET LEUR COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE | [2023/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2020021489 (UNIV OF SHARJAH [AE]) | International search | [A]EP0130878 (SYNTHELABO [FR]) [A] 1-20 * whole document *; | [A]FR2548667 (SYNTHELABO [FR]) [A] 1-20* whole document * |