EP4093585 - STACK CUTTING APPARATUS HAVING A FIRST STACK POSITIONING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMANN, Jann 97297 Waldbüttelbrunn / DE | 02 /
PALME, Martin 97270 Kist / DE | 03 /
SAUER, Jens 97072 Würzburg / DE | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Koenig & Bauer AG - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21786888.4 | 04.10.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021EP77254 | Priority number, date | DE202010129872 | 12.11.2020 Original published format: DE102020129872 | [2022/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022100928 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093585 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4093585 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/01, B26D7/06, B26D1/08, B26D11/00 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
B26D7/015 (EP);
B26D1/08 (EP,US);
B26D11/00 (EP,US);
B26D7/025 (US);
B26D7/0675 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAPELSCHNEIDEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER ERSTEN STAPELPOSITIONIEREINRICHTUNG | [2022/48] | English: | STACK CUTTING APPARATUS HAVING A FIRST STACK POSITIONING DEVICE | [2022/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPE DE PILES DOTÉ D'UN PREMIER DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT DE PILES | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 23.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 29.11.2023 | |
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1593467 (SENATOR TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2332864 (KOLBUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,13* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | DE19515705 | EP1504860 | DE202006012879U | DE102020113641 | by applicant | DE19515705 | DE19843011 | DE10124068 | EP1504860 | EP1593467 |