EP4225084 - AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JT International SA 8, rue Kazem Radjavi 1202 Geneva / CH | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Alec Guildford Surrey GU2 7SU / GB | 02 /
ROGAN, Andrew Aberdeenshire IV36 2ZH / GB | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 21786955.1 | 05.10.2021 | [2023/33] | WO2021EP77469 | Priority number, date | EP20200200903 | 08.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20200903 | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022074013 | Date: | 14.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4225084 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/46, A24F40/40, // A24F40/20 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
A24F40/46 (EP);
A24F40/40 (EP);
A24F40/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/33] | A24F40/46, A24F40/40, A24F40/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/33] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATING DEVICE | [2023/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 05.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017055580 (BLANDINO THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0138]; figures 4A-4B *; | [A]EP3228199 (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO [CN]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] *; | [A]WO2019121668 (JT INT SA [CH]) [A] 1-14 * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 13; figure -; claim - *; | [A]CN209732595U (BEIJING ZHIXIN WUMA INFORMATION TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0122]; figure - *; | [A]WO2019238814 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 20; figure - * * page 10, line 10 - line 33; claim - * |