EP4232274 - FILLING UNIT FOR A ROTARY PRESS, AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING AN OPTIMIZED ROTARY PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syntegon Technology GmbH Stuttgarter Straße 130 71332 Waiblingen / DE | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINZ, Thomas 73266 Bissingen an der Teck / DE | 02 /
WERNER, Fabian 71336 Waiblingen / DE | 03 /
GRASS, Torsten 73660 Urbach / DE | 04 /
MÖSSINGER, Matthias 71577 Großerlach / DE | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21790401.0 | 06.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021EP77511 | Priority number, date | DE202010127992 | 23.10.2020 Original published format: DE102020127992 | [2023/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022084035 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4232274 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/08, B30B15/30 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
B30B11/08 (EP,KR,US);
B30B15/304 (US);
B30B15/0023 (KR);
B30B15/308 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | FÜLLEINHEIT FÜR EINE RUNDLAUFPRESSE UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER OPTIMIERTEN RUNDLAUFPRESSE | [2023/35] | English: | FILLING UNIT FOR A ROTARY PRESS, AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING AN OPTIMIZED ROTARY PRESS | [2023/35] | French: | UNITÉ DE REMPLISSAGE POUR PRESSE ROTATIVE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PRESSE ROTATIVE OPTIMISÉE | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 31.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE202007002707U (IMA KILIAN GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]WO2015186905 (HANMI PHARM IND CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2018036981 (TSUKADA KOJI [JP], et al); | [AD]EP3406436 (KORSCH AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE3527186 | DE202007002707U | DE102016110556 | EP3406436 |