EP4141030 - ANTI-CD73 ANTIBODY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akeso Biopharma, Inc. 6 Shennong Road Torch Developmental Zone Zhongshan, Guangdong 528437 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | For all designated states Akeso Biopharma Inc. 6 Shennong Road Torch Developmental Zone Zhongshan, Guangdong 528437 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Zhongmin No.6 Shennong Road, Torch Development Zone Zhongshan Guangdong 528437 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Peng No.6 Shennong Road, Torch Development Zone Zhongshan Guangdong 528437 / CN | 03 /
LI, Baiyong No.6 Shennong Road, Torch Development Zone Zhongshan Guangdong 528437 / CN | 04 /
XIA, Yu No.6 Shennong Road, Torch Development Zone Zhongshan Guangdong 528437 / CN | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21792447.1 | 22.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021CN88987 | Priority number, date | CN202010324782 | 22.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010324782 | CN202011152518 | 23.10.2020 Original published format: CN202011152518 | [2023/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021213466 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4141030 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C12N15/13, C12N15/63, C12N5/10, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, C12N5/12, G01N33/574 | [2024/36] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (IL);
A61K47/68 (IL);
A61K47/6801 (CN,IL);
A61K47/6849 (US);
A61K47/6871 (US);
A61K9/0019 (CN,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07K16/00 (IL);
C07K16/28 (IL);
C07K16/30 (IL);
C07K16/40 (US);
C07K19/00 (IL);
C12N15/63 (IL);
C12N5/10 (IL);
C12N5/12 (EP);
C12N5/163 (IL);
G01N33/574 (KR);
G01N33/57492 (EP);
G01N33/6872 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (CN,IL,KR);
A61K2039/54 (CN,IL);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/31 (KR);
C07K2317/52 (EP,CN,IL);
C07K2317/56 (CN,IL);
C07K2317/565 (CN,IL,US);
C07K2317/71 (EP);
C07K2317/73 (KR);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (CN,IL);
C12N2502/1178 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/09] | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C12N15/13, C12N15/63, C12N5/10, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | ANTI-CD73-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/09] | English: | ANTI-CD73 ANTIBODY AND USE THEREOF | [2023/09] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CD73 ET SON UTILISATION | [2023/09] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2022 | Translation filed | 24.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2016055609 (INNATE PHARMA [FR]); | [I]US2016129108 (SACHSENMEIER KRIS [US], et al); | [I]WO2016075099 (MEDIMMUNE LTD [GB]); | [I]WO2016081748 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [I]WO2016131950 (INNATE PHARMA [FR]); | [I]WO2017064043 (INNATE PHARMA [FR], et al); | [I]WO2017152085 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [I]WO2018137598 (I MAB); | [I]WO2018237157 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [I]WO2019173291 (PHANES THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) | International search | [A]CN106852149 (INNATE PHARMA); | [A]CN107001474 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO); | [A]CN109154611 (CORVUS PHARMACEUTICALS INC, et al); | [A]CN109476755 (I MAB); | [A]CN110072891 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC); | [A]CN110753703 (HELMHOLTZ ZENTRUM MUENCHEN DEUTSCHES FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM GESUNDHEIT & UMWELT GMBH); | [A]CN110785187 (NOVARTIS AG, et al) | by applicant | US4816567 | US2016129108 |