EP4139199 - MODULAR UNDERWATER VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lautrup, Robert W. 11700 Talley Court Oakton, Virginia 22124 / US | For all designated states Mulligan, Anthony C. 15408 Camino Agua Azul Sahuarita, Arizona 85629 / US | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/09] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 21792784.7 | 23.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021US28938 | Priority number, date | US202016858446 | 24.04.2020 Original published format: US202016858446 | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021217065 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4139199 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/10, B63B1/12, B63B3/02, B63B3/04, B63B3/06, B63B35/00, F41J2/00, F41J9/04, F42B19/36 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B63G8/001 (EP,US);
B63G8/04 (US);
B63G8/08 (EP,US);
B63G8/28 (EP,US);
F41J2/00 (EP);
F41J9/04 (EP);
F42B19/36 (EP);
G01C21/16 (EP,US);
G01S15/93 (US);
G01S19/015 (US);
G01S19/18 (EP);
G01S19/35 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/09] | B63B1/10, B63B1/12, B63B3/02, B63B3/04, B63B3/06, B63B35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | MODULARES UNTERWASSERFAHRZEUG | [2023/09] | English: | MODULAR UNDERWATER VEHICLE | [2023/09] | French: | VÉHICULE SOUS-MARIN MODULAIRE | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03059734 (HAFMYND EHF [IS], et al); | [XI]US2008041294 (DIORIO RICHARD A [US], et al); | [XI]EP1360108 (ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]); | [XI]US2012037059 (BRENNER AXEL [DE]); | [XI]US8677920 (JENG JACK ING [US]); | [XI]US2019056200 (TEETZEL JAMES W [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5995882 (PATTERSON MARK R [US], et al); | [A]US2008041294 (DIORIO RICHARD A [US], et al); | [A]US2012137949 (VOSBURGH FREDERICK [US]); | [A]US8205570 (TUREAUD THOMAS F [US], et al); | [A]US2018251199 (RADFORD NICOLAUS [US], et al) |