EP4139040 - HOLLOW CORE GRANULES, PRODUCTS INCORPORATING THE GRANULES, AND METHODS OF PREPARING THE GRANULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Church & Dwight Co., Inc. 469 North Harrison Street Princeton, New Jersey 08543-5297 / US | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOMES, Andre Vieira 471 Harmony Road Jackson, New Jersey 08527 / US | 02 /
BUTERA, Adam E. 230 Yorkshire Road Fairless Hills, Pennsylvania 19030 / US | 03 /
EGOYANTS, Petr A. 62 Dobrovoltsev, Apt. 72 St. Petersburg, 198334 / RU | 04 /
CHEPURNAYA, Irina A. 192148 Nevzorovoy st. 3, Apt. 94 Saint Petersburg, 192148 / RU | 05 /
KARUSHEV, Mikhail P. Ispolkomskaya st. b. 9/11, Apt. 21 Saint Petersburg, 191167 / RU | 06 /
BYKOV, Vadim A. Kosmonavtov prospekt 52/2 Saint Petersburg, 196233 / RU | 07 /
ILYIN, Ilya 13 Ridgefield Road Wayland, Massachusetts 01778 / US | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21792978.5 | 23.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021US28821 | Priority number, date | US202063014911P | 24.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063014911 P | [2023/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021216986 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4139040 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/12, B01J13/18, B05D3/02, A01N25/28, C05G5/00, D06M23/12 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
B01J13/04 (EP,KR);
A01K1/0152 (EP);
A01K1/0154 (EP);
A01K1/0155 (EP);
A01N25/12 (EP);
B01J20/043 (EP,KR);
B01J20/045 (EP,KR);
B01J20/046 (EP,KR);
B01J20/12 (EP,KR);
B01J20/165 (EP,KR);
B01J20/20 (EP,KR);
B01J20/28021 (EP,KR);
B01J20/2803 (EP,KR);
B01J20/3028 (EP,KR);
B01J20/3042 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/09] | B01J13/12, B01J13/18, B05D3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | HOHLKERNGRANULAT, PRODUKTE MIT DEM GRANULAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GRANULATS | [2023/09] | English: | HOLLOW CORE GRANULES, PRODUCTS INCORPORATING THE GRANULES, AND METHODS OF PREPARING THE GRANULES | [2023/09] | French: | GRANULES À NOYAU CREUX, PRODUITS INCORPORANT LES GRANULES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DES GRANULES | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 19.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4440732 (TAKEDA TSUNESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US10486128 (KAWANAMI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US2020093711 (HAMERSKY MARK WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,15-20 * §[0009];; figure 1; examples 1,2,4 * [I] 3,5,8-14,21-23; | [A] - ASADA TAKUMI ET AL, "Mechanism of the formation of hollow spherical granules using a high shear granulator", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, NL, (20180501), vol. 117, doi:10.1016/j.ejps.2018.03.009, ISSN 0928-0987, pages 371 - 378, XP093124532 [A] 1-23 * Abstract.;; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejps.2018.03.009 | [A] - ROXANA-ELENA AVRAMESCU ET AL, "Liquid Marbles: From Industrial to Medical Applications", MOLECULES, DE, (20180509), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.3390/molecules23051120, ISSN 1433-1373, page 1120, XP055685350 [A] 1-23 * page 17 - page 18; figures 13-14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules23051120 | International search | [A]US2007036705 (BUTTS MATTHEW D [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * Entire document *; | [X]US2008251027 (KIRSCH BRADLEY [US], et al) [X] 38-48 * Entire document, especially Abstract, [0013]; [0056-[0057]; [0069]; [0072]-[0075]; [0153]; [0187]; [0233]; [0258]; [0349]-[0350]; [0354]-[0355] *; | [A]US2008269447 (SHIRAI AYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-48 * Entire document *; | [A]US8696955 (XIA YOUNAN [US], et al) [A] 1-48* Entire document *; | [A]US9033040 (PISKLAK THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * Entire document *; | [XY]US9253961 (FRITTER CHARLES F [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-13, 15-23, (24-31, 33-37)/(1-3, 15-23) * Entire document, especially Abstract, col 5 In 18-41; col 6 In 6-8, 54-57; col 7 In 29-30, 38-47; col 9 In 12-14; col 10 In 14-19; col 12 In 13-15; col 14 In 1-4; col 15 In 38-40; col 19 In 37-67; col 20 In 1 * [Y] (31-36)/24/( 1, 4, 14), 32/31/24/(1-3, 5-13, 15-23); | [XY]US9648884 (GAUNT SARAH [GB], et al) [X] 1, 4, 12-14, (24-30, 37)/(1, 4, 12-14) * Entire document, especially Abstract, col 1 In 20-25, 37-39; col 2 In 47-56; col 3 In 23-25, 40-51; col 4 In 45-49; col 5 In 20-21 * [Y] (31-36)/24/(1, 4, 12-14), 32/31/24/(1-3, 5-13, 15-23) |