EP4141046 - POLYSILOXANE-POLYCARBONATE COPOLYMER USING HYDROXY-TERMINATED POLYSILOXANE MIXTURE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samyang Corporation 31, Jong-ro 33-gil Jongno-gu Seoul 03129 / KR | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Yun Ju 1001-301, 61, Baeul 2-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34020 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Kyung Moo 47, Eoro 3-gil, Buksam-eup Chilgok-gun Gyeongsangbuk-do 39804 / KR | 03 /
KANG, Ki Tae 601-1302, 362, Gimpohangang 2-ro Gimpo-si Gyeonggi-do 10081 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Mi Ran 107-504, 300, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34050 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Seung Pil 1609-1704, 176, Taebong-ro Gwangju-si Gyeonggi-do 12788 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Jin Sik 102-102, 13, Songnim-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34061 / KR | 07 /
HEO, Seong Hyen 1907-1204, 15, Balgeuntteul-ro Sejong 30062 / KR | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Schrell, Andreas, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21793643.4 | 22.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021KR05079 | Priority number, date | KR20200049940 | 24.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200049940 | [2023/09] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021215838 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4141046 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/18, C08G77/42, C08G64/16, C08G64/08, C08G64/02, C08G77/18, C08G77/50, C08L69/00, C08L83/10 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
C08G64/186 (EP,KR);
C08G77/448 (EP,US);
C08G64/0233 (KR);
C08G64/0241 (KR);
C08G64/081 (KR);
C08G64/16 (KR);
C08G64/24 (EP);
C08G77/18 (KR);
C08G77/42 (KR);
C08G77/458 (US);
C08G77/50 (KR);
C08L69/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | POLYSILOXAN-POLYCARBONAT-COPOLYMER MIT EINER HYDROXYTERMINIERTEN POLYSILOXANMISCHUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/09] | English: | POLYSILOXANE-POLYCARBONATE COPOLYMER USING HYDROXY-TERMINATED POLYSILOXANE MIXTURE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2023/09] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE POLYSILOXANE-POLYCARBONATE UTILISANT UN MÉLANGE DE POLYSILOXANE À TERMINAISONS HYDROXY ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2022 | Translation filed | 24.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2460837 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2013066002 (SAMYANG CORP [KR]) | International search | [Y]JP2011102364 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD); | [A]KR20130047332 (SAMYANG CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20130047612 (SAMYANG CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20160002485 (SAMYANG CORP [KR], et al); | [Y]KR20200033365 (SAMYANG CORP [KR]) | by applicant | US2999835 | US3028365 | US3153008 | US3334154 | US2003105226 |