EP4155294 - COMPOUND FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING LIPID METABOLISM-RELATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fudan University No. 220 Handan Road Yangpu District Shanghai 200433 / CN | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Boxun 2005 Songhu Road Shanghai 200438 / CN | 02 /
FU, Yuhua 2005 Songhu Road Shanghai 200438 / CN | 03 /
DING, Yu 2005 Songhu Road Shanghai 200438 / CN | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/13] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21793702.8 | 23.04.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021CN89453 | Priority number, date | CN202010328911 | 23.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010328911 | [2023/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021213518 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4155294 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/34, C07D403/06, C07D311/16, C07D239/88, C07D403/12, C07D487/04, C07D401/12, C07D513/04, C07D409/14, C07D239/70, C07J9/00, A61P3/00, A61P3/04, A61P3/10, A61P1/16, A61P35/00, A61P9/10, A61P25/28, A61K31/352, A61K31/404 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
C07D209/34 (EP,CN);
A61K47/545 (EP,US);
A61K41/00 (US);
A61K47/54 (EP);
A61K47/55 (US);
A61K47/554 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,CN);
A61P25/28 (EP,CN);
A61P3/00 (EP,CN);
A61P3/04 (EP,CN);
A61P3/06 (US);
A61P3/10 (EP,CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
A61P9/10 (EP,CN);
C07D239/70 (CN);
C07D239/88 (CN);
C07D239/90 (EP);
C07D311/16 (EP,CN);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN);
C07D403/06 (CN);
C07D403/12 (CN);
C07D409/14 (CN);
C07D417/12 (EP);
C07D417/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DEM LIPIDSTOFFWECHSEL | [2023/13] | English: | COMPOUND FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING LIPID METABOLISM-RELATED DISEASES | [2023/13] | French: | COMPOSÉ POUR LA PRÉVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES LIÉES AU MÉTABOLISME LIPIDIQUE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2022 | Translation filed | 17.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019290778 (NOMURA DANIEL K [US], et al) | International search | [A]CN101106998 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1-9, 15-17, 23-27 * entire document *; | [XA] - Lang Wenjie, Yuan Chaonan, Zhu Biwei, Pan Sijun, Liu Jian, Luo Jie, Nie Shikun, Zhu Qing, Lee Jun-Seok, Ge Jingyan, "Expanding the “minimalist” small molecule tagging approach to different bioactive compounds", Organic & Biomolecular Chemistry, Royal Society of Chemistry, (20190313), vol. 17, no. 11, doi:10.1039/C8OB03175D, ISSN 1477-0520, pages 3010 - 3017, XP055859536 [X] 1-3, 5, 9, 15, 23 * p. 3012, figure 2 and p. 3010, the abstract * [A] 4, 6-8, 16, 17, 24-27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C8OB03175D | [A] - Li Zhaoyang; Wang Cen; Wang Ziying; Zhu Chenggang; Li Jie; Sha Tian; Ma Lixiang; Gao Chao; Yang Yi; Sun Yimin; Wang Jian; Sun Xiaoli; Lu Chenqi; Difiglia Marian; Mei Yanai; Ding Chen; Luo Shouqing; Dang Yongjun; Ding Yu; Fei Yiyan; Lu Boxun, "Allele-selective lowering of mutant HTT protein by HTT-LC3 linker compounds", Nature, Nature Publishing Group UK, London, London, (20191030), vol. 575, no. 7781, doi:10.1038/s41586-019-1722-1, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 203 - 209, XP036932218 [A] 1-9, 15-17, 23-27 * pp. 203-209 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41586-019-1722-1 | [A] - Naumov Mikael, Nuchev Alexander, Sitnikov Nikolay, Malysheva Yulia, Shavyrin Andrew, Beletskaya Irina, Gavryushin Andrei, Combes Sebastien, Fedorov Alexey, "2-(Azidomethyl)arylboronic Acids in the Synthesis of Coumarin-Type Compounds", SYNTHESIS, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, STUTTGART, DE., STUTTGART, DE. , (20090501), vol. 2009, no. 10, doi:10.1055/s-0028-1088058, ISSN 0039-7881, pages 1673 - 1682, XP055859538 [A] 1-9, 15-17, 23-27 * pp. 1673-1682 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-0028-1088058 | by applicant | - J. RAUTIO et al., Nature Reviews Drug Discovery, (20080000), vol. 7, pages 255 - 270 | - FAM et al., "Recent Advances in Fluorescent Probes for Lipid Droplets.", Materials, (20180000), vol. 11, page 1768 | - "Uniprot", Database accession no. Q9H492-2 | - MANDAL, "Quantum Dot-Based Designed Nanoprobe for Imaging Lipid Droplet", J. Phys. Chem. C, (20170000), vol. 121, no. 42, pages 23727 - 23735 | - CAS , no. 945595-80-2 | - SOOKOIAN S et al., "Fatty Liver Disease Progresses into Severe NASH when Physiological Mechanisms of Tissue Homeostasis Collapse", Ann Hepatol, (20180000), vol. 17, pages 182 - 186 | - LI, Z.WANG, C.WANG, Z. et al., "Allele-selective lowering of mutant HTT protein by HTT-LC3 linker compounds", Nature, (20190000), vol. 575, doi:10.1038/s41586-019-1722-1, pages 203 - 209, XP036932218 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41586-019-1722-1 | - ZHU et al., Sensors (Basel, (20160000), vol. 16, no. 3, page 378 | - FEI et al., J Biomed Opt, (20100000), vol. 15, no. 1, page 016018 |