|
28.08.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
22.08.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.08.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2023 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2023 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2023 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2023 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2023 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.03.2023 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2023 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2023 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2023 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.01.2023 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
20.01.2023 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.01.2023 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.01.2023 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.01.2023 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.09.2022 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2022 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.08.2022 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
22.08.2022 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.08.2022 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Reply to Form IPEA424 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.07.2022 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.07.2022 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.07.2022 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.07.2022 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
19.07.2022 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.07.2022 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.07.2022 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.05.2022 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
04.11.2021 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
05.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
21 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |