Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023330024 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE2051170 | 05.10.2020 | WO2021EP77420 | 05.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023545990 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | SE2051170 | 05.10.2020 | WO2021EP77420 | 05.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116583289 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | SE2051170 | 05.10.2020 | WO2021EP77420 | 05.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4178584 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2023 | C0 | EP4178584 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2023 | B1 | EP4178584 | 17.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE2051170 | 05.10.2020 | WO2021EP77420 | 05.10.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2965526T | 15.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | SE2051170 | 05.10.2020 | WO2021EP77420 | 05.10.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022073990 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE2051170 | 05.10.2020 |