EP4178584 - HYDROXYAPATITE COMPOSITION COMPRISING ZOLEDRONIC ACID AND DOXORUBICIN FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Moroxite T AB Kung Oscars väg 11c 222 35 Lund / SE | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIDGREN, Lars 298 31 TOLLARP / SE | 02 /
TÄGIL, Magnus 298 31 TOLLARP / SE | 03 /
RAINA, Deepak 298 31 TOLLARP / SE | 04 /
YANG, Liu 298 31 TOLLARP / SE | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 21793863.8 | 05.10.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021EP77420 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 23.11.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2023/52] | 29.11.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/01] | 29.11.2023 | Date of registration [2024/01] | 25.10.2023 | Date of legal effect [2024/01] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 29.11.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/01] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4178584 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 04 |