EP4233266 - A CIRCUIT FOR AND METHOD OF PROCESSING A DATA STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xilinx, Inc. Attn: Legal Department 2100 Logic Drive San Jose CA 95124 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOVELLINI, Paolo San Jose, California 95124 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | McGlashan, Graham Stewart Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 21794263.0 | 01.09.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021US48766 | Priority number, date | US202017130991 | 22.12.2020 Original published format: US202017130991 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022139891 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4233266 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/00, H03L7/091 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H04L7/033 (EP,KR,US);
H03L7/0807 (EP,KR);
H03L7/099 (EP,KR);
H04L7/0041 (KR,US);
H03L2207/06 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES DATENSTROMS | [2023/35] | English: | A CIRCUIT FOR AND METHOD OF PROCESSING A DATA STREAM | [2023/35] | French: | CIRCUIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE FLUX DE DONNÉES | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 23.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008022143 (SCOUTEN SHAWN [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0080] ** figure 2 *; | [A]US8666010 (NOVELLINI PAOLO [IT]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 2, line 15 - line 61 * * column 5, line 53 - column 8, line 24 * * figures 1-8 * * column 9, line 16 - column 10, line 24 *; | [I]KR102127263B (ZARAM TECH [KR]) [I] 1-15 * figures 3,7 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0073] * |