EP4214358 - PALLET OUTER PACKAGING PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | 17.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mondi AG Marxergasse 4A 1030 Wien / AT | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGLUND, Lars Göran 85468 Sundsvall / SE | 02 /
SCHWAIGER, Elisabeth 9431 St. Stefan / AT | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Cunow, Gerda Cunow Patentanwalts KG Engerthstraße 146/3/1 1200 Wien / AT | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 21794706.8 | 15.09.2021 | [2023/30] | WO2021AT60327 | Priority number, date | AT20200050785 | 16.09.2020 Original published format: AT 507852020 | [2023/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022056567 | Date: | 24.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4214358 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D21H15/02, D21H17/28, D21H21/18, D21H27/02, D21H27/10 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
D21H27/10 (EP,AT,CZ,FI,GB,PL,SE);
B65D19/00 (FI,SE);
D21H15/02 (EP,CZ,FI,GB,SE);
D21H11/04 (PL);
B65D71/0085 (ES);
B65D19/0004 (ES);
B65D19/02 (FI);
B65D71/06 (FI);
D21F11/02 (AT,PL);
D21H17/23 (PL);
D21H17/28 (EP,CZ,FI,GB,PL,SE);
D21H17/29 (PL);
D21H21/16 (PL);
D21H21/18 (EP,CZ,FI,GB,PL,SE);
D21H27/02 (EP,CZ,FI,GB,PL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] | Title | German: | PALETTEN-UMVERPACKUNGSPAPIER | [2023/30] | English: | PALLET OUTER PACKAGING PAPER | [2023/30] | French: | PAPIER D'EMBALLAGE DE PALETTE | [2023/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 17.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5351461 (FANDARD PHILIPPE [FR], et al); | [XYI]EP2955269 (BILLERUDKORSNAES AB [SE]); | [AD]EP3211135 (BILLERUDKORSNAES AB [SE]); | [Y]WO2017163176 (STORA ENSO OYJ [FI]); | [XDYI]EP3385442 (BILLERUDKORSNAES AB [SE]); | [A]EP3385444 (BILLERUDKORSNAES AB [SE]); | [A]EP3633104 (BILLERUDKORSNAES AB [SE]) | by applicant | DE4018111 | FR2675466 | JPH05310211 | EP0533520 | EP3211135 | EP3211135 | EP3385442 |