EP4168502 - AQUEOUS INK COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Chemical Corporation 35 Waterview Boulevard Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ILLSLEY, Derek Midsomer Norton, Somerset BA3 4RT / GB | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21794917.1 | 06.10.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021GB52578 | Priority number, date | US202063091377P | 14.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063091377 P | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022079414 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168502 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4168502 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/03, C09D175/00, C09D11/106, C09D11/102, C09D11/10, C09D5/00, C08L75/00, C08G18/00, C08G18/79, C08L75/04, C09D5/02 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
C09D11/10 (EP);
C09D11/107 (US);
C08G18/797 (EP);
C08L75/04 (EP);
C09D11/03 (EP,US);
C09D11/102 (EP);
C09D11/106 (EP);
C09D11/30 (EP);
C09D11/38 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L33/08, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08L33/08, C08L75/04, C08K5/5415 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08L33/00 (EP);
C09D133/08, C08L75/04 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE TINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2023/17] | English: | AQUEOUS INK COMPOSITIONS | [2023/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ENCRE AQUEUSE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 19.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23173174.6 / EP4234645 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | DK | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | IT | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | MC | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | LU | 06.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
DK | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
MC | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 06.10.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
MC | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 06.10.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 06.10.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2018105710 (HONG WENBIN [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-35,37-44 * claims; examples * * paragraphs [0043] , [0065] - [0070] - [0 81] , [0 91] * [I] 11,12,36; | [X]CN108912984 (SHANGHAI DASHAN NEW MATERIAL TECH CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-9,11-19,24-27,29-37,40-42,44* claim 1; examples * | by applicant | WO0136547 | JP2002294112 | JP2004149600 | JP2006045334 | JP2006264228 | US2007109375 | US7338988 | US7354476 | JP2009149774 | WO2009137753 | US7638561 | US7947760 | JP2012241135 | JP2015093954 | US9249324 | US2017029639 | WO2017021278 | US2017218565 | WO2017174981 | WO2018138525 | WO2018138720 | US10076909 | EP3390545 | US2019106587 | WO2019074683 | US10513622 | CN110982344 | WO2020102788 | - N.KESSEL, J.Coat.Technol.Res., (20080000), no. 5, page 285 | - PARVATE, J.Disp.Sci.Tech, (20190000), vol. 40, page 519 |