EP4228401 - METHOD AND ASSEMBLY FOR HARVESTING INSECT EGGS AND FOR FARMING INSECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dorset Group B.V. Weverij 26 7122 MS Aalten / NL | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAARING, Hendrikus 7122 MS Aalten / NL | 02 /
ZENTS, Antonius Jozephus Maria 7122 MS Aalten / NL | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Patent Business B.V. Lange Amerikaweg 81 7332 BP Apeldoorn / NL | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 21795027.8 | 15.10.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021NL50626 | Priority number, date | NL20202026684 | 15.10.2020 Original published format: NL 2026684 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022081014 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4228401 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/033 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
A01K67/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM ERNTEN VON INSEKTENEIERN UND ZUM ZÜCHTEN VON INSEKTEN | [2023/34] | English: | METHOD AND ASSEMBLY FOR HARVESTING INSECT EGGS AND FOR FARMING INSECTS | [2023/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ENSEMBLE POUR LA RÉCOLTE D'OEUFS D'INSECTES ET L'ÉLEVAGE D'INSECTES | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 15.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4411220 (VOEGELE JEAN D [FR], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [I]US2018049416 (LEO DANIEL MICHAEL [US]) [I] 1-19 * paragraphs [0173] - [0207] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2019021296 (HEETJANS KAI [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0093] ** figure 2 *; | [A]US2020288685 (ROOD NICO [NL], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0058] , [0 66] , [ 105] - [0133] * * figures 3A-5D * | by applicant | WO2008040033 | KR20120097205 | US2013319334 | EP2703372 | WO2016153338 | WO2017223096 | WO2018029597 | US2018049416 | WO2019125165 |