EP4196866 - DEVICES, METHODS, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACES FOR INTERACTING WITH THREE-DIMENSIONAL ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROCKEL, Philipp Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
LEMAY, Stephen O. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
SORRENTINO III, William A. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
YERKES, Giancarlo Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
HENDERSON, Nicholas W. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
BUTCHER, Gary I. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 07 /
DELLINGER, Richard R. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 08 /
IVE, Jonathan Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 09 /
DYE, Alan C. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 10 /
JAEDE, Julian Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 11 /
HOENIG, Julian Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 12 /
HANKEY, M. Evans Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 13 /
SI WAN, Wan Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/26] |
Former [2023/25] | 01 /
ROCKEL, Philipp Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
02 /
LEMAY, Stephen O. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
03 /
SORRENTINO III, William A. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
04 /
YERKES, Giancarlo Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
05 /
HENDERSON, Nicholas W. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
BUTCHER, Gary I. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
07 /
DELLINGER, Richard R. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
08 /
IVE, Jonathan Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
09 /
DYE, Alan C. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
10 /
JAEDE, Julian Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
11 /
HOENIG, Julian Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
12 /
HANKEY, M. Evans Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
13 /
WAN, Si Wan Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21795103.7 | 24.09.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021US52027 | Priority number, date | US202063083816P | 25.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063083816 P | US202117483730 | 23.09.2021 Original published format: US202117483730 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022067083 | Date: | 31.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4196866 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/04815, G06F3/04842, G06F3/0346, G06T19/00, A63B71/06, A63F13/428, A63F13/213, A63F13/426, A63F13/655 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/013 (EP,CN);
G06T15/10 (KR,US);
A63F13/213 (EP,KR);
A63F13/426 (EP,KR);
A63F13/428 (EP,KR);
A63F13/655 (EP,KR);
G06F3/012 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/0346 (EP,KR);
G06F3/04815 (EP,KR);
G06F3/04817 (CN);
G06F3/0482 (CN);
G06F3/04842 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/04883 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | G06F3/01, A63F13/428, G06F3/04842, A63B71/06, G06F3/04815, G06T19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND GRAFISCHE BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHEN ZUR INTERAKTION MIT DREIDIMENSIONALEN UMGEBUNGEN | [2023/25] | English: | DEVICES, METHODS, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACES FOR INTERACTING WITH THREE-DIMENSIONAL ENVIRONMENTS | [2023/25] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, PROCÉDÉS ET INTERFACES UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUES POUR INTERAGIR AVEC DES ENVIRONNEMENTS TRIDIMENSIONNELS | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 15.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2024/26] | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2017109936 (POWDERLY JAMES M [US], et al); | [A]US2019182355 (CLEMENT MANUEL CHRISTIAN [US], et al); | [A]US10481755 (NGO KEVIN [US], et al); | [I]US2020142475 (PAEZ GABRIEL M [US], et al) |