EP4143465 - TOP ENTRY VALVE FOR SEVERE INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Velan Inc. 7007 Côte de Liesse St-Laurent, Québec H4T 1G2 / CA | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOURDEL, Nicolas Hervé François Montreal, Québec H4T 1G2 / CA | 02 /
PAQUIN, Michel Sylvain Mario Montreal, Québec H4T 1G2 / CA | 03 /
KHELFAOUI, Fadila Montreal, Québec H4T 1G2 / CA | 04 /
VERNHES, Luc David Montreal, Québec H4T 1G2 / CA | 05 /
NGUYEN, Vinh Van Montreal, Québec H4T 1G2 / CA | 06 /
TRAN, Duc Thanh Montreal, Québec H4T 1G2 / CA | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | CSY London Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21795770.3 | 27.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021IB53479 | Priority number, date | US202063016423P | 28.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063016423 P | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021220165 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143465 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/08, F16K27/06, F16K5/06, F16K5/20, F16K41/00, F16K37/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
F16K5/0636 (EP,US);
F16K27/067 (EP,US);
F16K27/12 (US);
F16K37/0041 (EP,US);
F16K41/003 (EP,US);
F16K5/0657 (US);
F16K5/0689 (EP,US);
F16K5/0694 (EP,US);
F16K5/0605 (US);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | F16K5/08, F16K27/06, F16K5/06, F16K5/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | VENTIL MIT OBEREM EINGANG FÜR SCHWERE INDUSTRIELLE ANWENDUNGEN | [2023/10] | English: | TOP ENTRY VALVE FOR SEVERE INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS | [2023/10] | French: | SOUPAPE À ENTRÉE SUPÉRIEURE POUR APPLICATIONS INDUSTRIELLES SÉVÈRES | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6073648 (WATSON JAMES L [US], et al); | [XAI]CN107339457 (KUNSHAN VIZA VALVE CO LTD) | International search | [XY]US3122352 (ANDERSON CLIFFORD E, et al) [XY] 1, 6, 9, 10, 12, 13, 15-18, 20, 21 / 2, 3, 7, 8, 11, 22, 23 *Entire document*; | [A]US4281819 (LINDER MORRIS B) [A] 1, 6, 7, 13, 16, 17, 21*Entire document*; | [A]US4292989 (CAZZANIGA ITALO, et al) [A] 1-3,6, 10-13, 15, 16,21-23 *Entire document*; | [A]US4388945 (JOHNSON DAVID A, et al) [A] 1,6, 10-12, 16, 21 *Figures 1-6*; | [XY]US4566482 (STUNKARD GERALD A [US]) [XY] 1,6,10-13,15,16,21/11 *Entire document*; | [A]US5056758 (BRAMBLET JOHN W [US]) [A] 1, 6, 7, 10-13, 16, 21 *Figures 1-3*; | [XY]CN2597783Y (JIANGSU SHENTONG VALVE CO LTD [CN]) [XY] 1-3, 10-12, 16, 21/ 2, 3, 11, 22, 23 *Entire document*; | [A]KR20060058081 (HY LOK CORP [KR]) [A] 1, 6, 7, 10-13, 16, 21 *Entire document*; | [Y]US2016109035 (MCCARTY MICHAEL WILDIE [US]) [Y] 7,8 *Entire document*; | [A]US2016356384 (JACKSON TRENTON FRANK [US]) [A] 1, 15, 16,21 *Figures 1-6* |