EP4144489 - CONTROL DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/10] | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku, Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAIJO, Hiroki Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
SODEYAMA, Yoshinao Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
VAHEERDEN, Kirill Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
KAWANAMI, Yasunori Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
KAMADA, Rui Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | 06 /
NISHIMURA, Naoki Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21795787.7 | 05.03.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021JP08799 | Priority number, date | JP20200078877 | 28.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020078877 | [2023/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021220614 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144489 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25J13/00, G05B19/042, B25J11/00, G06F3/048, B25J9/00, B25J9/16, // G06F3/01 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B25J11/008 (EP,US);
B25J11/0005 (EP,US);
B25J9/0003 (US);
B25J9/1612 (US);
B25J9/1674 (EP);
B25J9/1679 (EP);
G05B19/042 (EP);
G06F3/013 (EP);
G05B2219/40408 (EP);
G05B2219/40409 (EP);
G05B2219/40411 (EP);
G05B2219/40413 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | B25J13/00, G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2023/10] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2023/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2022 | Translation filed | 28.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 03.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2020031718 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9,13-15 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0118] * [I] 10,12; | [XI]US2020094403 (KUFFNER JAMES JOSEPH [US]) [X] 1,10,11,14,15 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0083] * [I] 12; | [X] - Mainprice Jim ET AL, "Planning Safe and Legible Hand-over Motions for Human-Robot Interaction", (20100101), pages 1 - 7, URL: https://hal.laas.fr/hal-01976223v1/preview/2010-iarp-mainprice.pdf#page=2, (20230906), XP093079535 [X] 1,14,15 * §II.B * | International search | [Y]JP2006272471 (ATR ADVANCED TELECOMM RES INST) [Y] 7-10, 13 * paragraphs [0025], [0033]-[0043], fig. 1, 3 *; | [Y]JP2007160442 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 4-5 * paragraphs [0153]-[0159], fig. 17 *; | [A]JP2008246665 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15* entire text, all drawings *; | [XYA]JP2012161851 (ATR ADVANCED TELECOMM RES INST) [X] 1-3, 6, 12, 14-15 * paragraphs [0043]-[0106], fig. 1-15 * [Y] 4-5, 7-10, 13 [A] 11; | [Y]JP2014176963 (TOYOTA ENG & MFG NORTH AMERICA) [Y] 4-5 * paragraph [0034], fig. 2B * |