EP4144728 - HETEROCYCLE AND GLUTARIMIDE SKELETON-BASED COMPOUND AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghaitech University No.393 Middle Huaxia Road Pudong District Shanghai 201210 / CN | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xiaobao Shanghai 201210 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Biao Shanghai 201210 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Linyi Shanghai 201210 / CN | 04 /
REN, Chaowei Shanghai 201210 / CN | 05 /
QIU, Xing Shanghai 201210 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Haixia Shanghai 201210 / CN | 07 /
SUN, Ning Shanghai 201210 / CN | 08 /
SUN, Renhong Shanghai 201210 / CN | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21796061.6 | 29.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021CN90964 | Priority number, date | CN202010366530 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010366530 | [2023/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219078 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144728 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D487/04, A61K31/4745, A61P35/00 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/454 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,CN);
A61P1/02 (EP,CN);
A61P1/04 (EP,CN);
A61P1/16 (EP,CN);
A61P11/00 (EP,CN);
A61P11/06 (EP,CN);
A61P17/06 (EP,CN);
A61P19/02 (EP,CN);
A61P19/08 (EP,CN);
A61P25/00 (EP,CN);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN);
A61P3/10 (EP,CN);
A61P31/00 (EP,CN);
A61P31/06 (EP,CN);
A61P31/14 (EP,CN);
A61P31/18 (EP,CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
A61P35/02 (EP,CN);
A61P37/06 (EP,CN);
A61P7/06 (EP,CN);
A61P9/04 (EP,CN);
A61P9/10 (EP,CN);
C07D401/04 (EP,CN);
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D453/02 (EP,CN,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/454, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG AUF GLUTARIMIDGERÜSTBASIS UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2023/10] | English: | HETEROCYCLE AND GLUTARIMIDE SKELETON-BASED COMPOUND AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF | [2023/10] | French: | COMPOSÉ HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE BASÉ SUR UN SQUELETTE DE GLUTARIMIDE ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2022 | Translation filed | 30.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 15.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2020114482 (SHANGHAI INST MATERIA MEDICA CAS [CN]) [XP] 1-15 * example - * * page 16; table - ** claim - * | International search | [A]WO2016065980 (KANGPU BIOPHARMACEUTICALS INC [CN]) [A] 1-37* entire document *; | [X]WO2019079569 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1, 2, 4, 8, 9, 13, 14, 23, 24, 32-34 * description, page 209, compound I-300 *; | [X]WO2020006264 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) [X] 1-37 * description, paragraphs [0010]-[0019], [0074] and [0102]-[0124], and paragraph [0073], compound (44) *; | [X]CN111051298 (NOVARTIS AG) [X] 1-37 * description, paragraphs [0010]-[0041], [0254], [0718]-[0721] and [0726]-[0743], and paragraph [0501], compound i-300 * | by applicant | WO2019196812 | - LIU D et al., Gen Comp Endocrinol, (20160000), vol. 228, page 1 | - CAS, no. 2378582-39-7 |