EP3975251 - METHOD FOR FORMING A MEMORY STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/13] | SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURE AND FORMING METHOD THEREFOR, MEMORY AND FORMING METHOD THEREFOR | ||
[2023/36] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changxin Memory Technologies, Inc. No. 388, Xingye Avenue Airport Industrial Park Economic and Technological Development Area Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Yiming Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | 02 /
PING, Erxuan Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 21797030.0 | 12.04.2021 | [2022/13] | WO2021CN86466 | Priority number, date | CN202010344169 | 27.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010344169 | [2022/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021218606 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975251 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3975251 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/786, H10B12/00, H10B53/30, H10B61/00, H10B63/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H01L29/78642 (EP);
H01L27/088 (CN);
H10B51/20 (US);
G11C7/18 (US);
H01L21/8234 (CN);
H10B12/02 (CN);
H10B12/0335 (EP);
H10B12/05 (EP);
H10B12/30 (CN);
H10B12/482 (EP);
H10B51/10 (US);
H10B53/30 (EP,CN);
H10B61/22 (EP,CN);
H10B63/34 (EP,CN);
H01L29/66666 (EP);
H01L29/7827 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | H01L27/088, H01L21/8234, H01L27/108, H01L27/11507, H01L27/22, H01L27/24, H01L21/8242 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE SPEICHERSTRUKTUR | [2023/36] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A MEMORY STRUCTURE | [2023/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UNE STRUCTURE MÉMOIRE | [2023/36] |
Former [2022/13] | HALBLEITERSTRUKTUR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, SPEICHER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2022/13] | SEMICONDUCTOR STRUCTURE AND FORMING METHOD THEREFOR, MEMORY AND FORMING METHOD THEREFOR | ||
Former [2022/13] | STRUCTURE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION, ET MÉMOIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2021 | Translation filed | 20.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 27.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2019157345 (ZHU HUILONG [US], et al); | [XA]WO2020042255 (INST OF MICROELECTRONICS CAS [CN]); | [XP]CN211719592U (CHANGXIN MEMORY TECH INC); | US2021335789 [ ] (ZHU HUILONG [US]) | International search | [A]US2012009760 (KIM JUN KI [KR]); | [A]US2013161710 (JI YUN-HYUCK [KR], et al); | [A]CN108461496 (RUILI INTEGRATED CIRCUIT CO LTD); | [X]CN109461738 (INST MICROELECTRONICS CAS); | [PX]CN211719592U (CHANGXIN MEMORY TECH INC) |