EP4145549 - PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT AND IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IZUCHI Masumi Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
IIJIMA Hiroaki Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
HIRADE Masaya Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
KISHIMOTO Yuko Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21797391.6 | 29.03.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021JP13173 | Priority number, date | JP20200078444 | 27.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020078444 | [2023/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021220691 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4145549 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10K30/30, H01L27/146, H10K39/32 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H01L27/14645 (EP);
H10K39/32 (EP,US);
H01L27/14601 (EP);
H01L27/14612 (EP);
H01L27/14621 (EP);
H10K30/30 (EP);
H10K30/353 (EP);
H10K2101/30 (EP);
H10K30/85 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | H01L51/42, H01L27/146 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | PHOTOELEKTRISCHES UMWANDLUNGSELEMENT UND ABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/10] | English: | PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT AND IMAGING DEVICE | [2023/10] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2022 | Translation filed | 24.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 15.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010134432 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0120]; figure 2(a)(b) * * examples SC-107, SC-112; table 1 *; | [XY]JP2014022525 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP) [X] 1-4,8-11 * paragraph [0032]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0036] , [0041] , [0048] , [0053] - [0055] - [0071] - [0073]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0079]; figure 8 * [Y] 12,13; | [Y]WO2019239851 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 12,13 * paragraph [0254] - paragraph [0263] *; | [XY]JP2020057686 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,3,4,8-10 * paragraphs [0016] , [0254] - [0262] - [0288]; figure 1 * [Y] 12,13; | [A] - SAKOMURA MASARU ET AL, "Effect of insertion of bathocuproine buffer layer at grating-structured cathode-organic-layer interface in bulk-heterojunction solar cells", AIP ADVANCES, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, 2 HUNTINGTON QUADRANGLE, MELVILLE, NY 11747, (20200122), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1063/1.5129351, XP012243971 [A] 1 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.5129351 | [A] - YOU HAILONG ET AL, "Low Temperature Aqueous Solution-Processed ZnO and Polyethylenimine Ethoxylated Cathode Buffer Bilayer for High Performance Flexible Inverted Organic Solar Cells", ENERGIES, (20170406), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.3390/en10040494, page 494, XP055868766 [A] 1 * figure 4(b) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/en10040494 | International search | [Y]JP2011222949 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 2 * [0067] *; | [A]US2018219110 (WICKS GARY [US])[A] 1-13; | [Y]WO2019239851 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 11-13 * [0037]-[0073], 1-2 *; | [XYA]JP2020057686 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,3-4,7-9 * 1-8 [0185] [0226]-[0227], [0254]-[0287] * [Y] 2,11-13 [A] 5-6,10; | [A] - You Hailong, Zhang Junchi, Zhang Zeyulin, Zhang Chunfu, Lin Zhenhua, Chang Jingjing, Han Genquan, Zhang Jincheng, Lu Gang, Hao Yue, "Low Temperature Aqueous Solution-Processed ZnO and Polyethylenimine Ethoxylated Cathode Buffer Bilayer for High Performance Flexible Inverted Organic Solar Cells", Energies, vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.3390/en10040494, page 494, XP055868766 [A] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/en10040494 | by applicant | JP4677314B | JP5969843B |