EP4072158 - EARPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Shokz Co., Ltd. Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26 Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states Shenzhen Shokz Co., Ltd. Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26 Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518108 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Zhen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Zhiqing Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Yonggen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | 04 /
MAO, Xinnan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | 05 /
YOU, Fen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 21797782.6 | 25.04.2021 | [2022/41] | WO2021CN89713 | Priority number, date | CN202020720094U | 30.04.2020 Original published format: CN 202020720094 U | CN202020720106U | 30.04.2020 Original published format: CN 202020720106 U | CN202010367108 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010367108 | [2022/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021218871 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072158 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, H04R1/28, H04R5/033, H04R9/06 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H04R1/105 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/1025 (EP,US);
H04R1/1058 (EP);
H04R1/1075 (EP);
H04R1/1091 (KR);
H04R1/1041 (EP);
H04R1/2811 (EP);
H04R2201/105 (EP);
H04R2201/107 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | H04R1/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | KOPFHÖRER | [2022/41] | English: | EARPHONE | [2022/41] | French: | ÉCOUTEUR | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2022 | Translation filed | 05.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 20.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009147971 (KUHR MARKUS [SG], et al); | [XY]CN109862491 (SHENZHEN VOXTECH CO LTD); | [Y]CA3103582 (SHENZHEN VOXTECH CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [Y]CN204131678U (SHENZHEN CHEYOU INTERCONNECTION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [Y]CN110677760 (DONGGUAN ZANGE ACOUSTIC TECH CO LTD); | [Y]CN210093555U (SHENZHEN JINGYIN TECH CO LTD); | [PX]CN211702350U (SHENZHEN VOXTECH LTD CORPORATION); | [PX]CN211702349U (SHENZHEN VOXTECH LTD CORPORATION) |