EP4185932 - MONITORING OF A POWER CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/22] | MONITORING OF A CONVERTER | ||
[2024/12] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innomotics GmbH Vogelweiherstraße 1-15 90441 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/03] |
Former [2023/22] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSCA, Cornel-Marian 92364 Deining / DE | 02 /
HECHT, Fabian 91207 Lauf / DE | 03 /
KÖGL, Stefan 90403 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21797966.5 | 15.10.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021EP78618 | Priority number, date | EP20200201982 | 15.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20201982 | [2023/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022079242 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4185932 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4185932 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
G05B23/0221 (EP);
G01R31/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG EINES STROMRICHTERS | [2023/22] | English: | MONITORING OF A POWER CONVERTER | [2024/12] | French: | SURVEILLANCE D'UN CONVERTISSEUR | [2024/12] |
Former [2023/22] | MONITORING OF A CONVERTER | ||
Former [2023/22] | SURVEILLANCE D'UN REDRESSEUR DE COURANT | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 24.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102011087764 (CONVERTEAM GMBH [DE]); | [XP]EP3787165 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [E]EP3985467 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); |