EP4208720 - METHODS FOR ISOLATING CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM SURFACE MARKER DISPLAYING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | 10.11.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meso Scale Technologies, LLC 1601 Research Boulevard Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUTENBERG, David Gaithersburg, Maryland 20878 / US | 02 /
SHACHAR, Sigal North Bethesda, Maryland 20852 / US | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 21798162.0 | 02.09.2021 | [2023/28] | WO2021US48849 | Priority number, date | US202063074696P | 04.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063074696 P | US202163234180P | 17.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163234180 P | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022051481 | Date: | 10.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4208720 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G01N33/543 (EP);
G01N33/6863 (US);
G01N33/54313 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (US);
G01N33/6872 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG VON MARKERN FÜR DIE OBERFLÄCHE DES ZENTRALEN NERVENSYSTEMS | [2023/28] | English: | METHODS FOR ISOLATING CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM SURFACE MARKER DISPLAYING AGENTS | [2023/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ISOLEMENT D'AGENTS PRÉSENTANT DES MARQUEURS DE SURFACE DU SYSTÈME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2023/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 31.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2015125477 (KUTTRUFF-COQUI SABRINA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-127 * par 0227. *; | [A]WO2015130956 (EXOSOME SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-127* the whole document *; | [A]WO2015175856 (MESO SCALE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-127 * pg 83, last par-pg 84, second par; cl 83-121, fig 1. *; | [Y]WO2019222708 (MESO SCALE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [Y] 1-127 * par 00102-00104, 00121, 00132, 00134-00138, 00161-00165, 00174-00179; cl 1-117. *; | [Y] - AURELI MASSIMO ET AL, "GM1 Ganglioside: Past Studies and Future Potential", MOLECULAR NEUROBIOLOGY, SPRINGER US, NEW YORK, vol. 53, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S12035-015-9136-Z, ISSN 0893-7648, (20150312), pages 1824 - 1842, (20150312), XP036236374 [Y] 1-127 * pg 1826, right col, third par. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12035-015-9136-z | [Y] - LAUC ET AL, "Shedding and uptake of gangliosides and glycosylphosphatidylinositol-anchored proteins", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060401), vol. 1760, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BBAGEN.2005.11.014, ISSN 0304-4165, pages 584 - 602, XP005401850 [Y] 1-127 * pg 586, left col, first par; fig 1b. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbagen.2005.11.014 | by applicant | US5238808 | US5240863 | US5641623 | US5846485 | US6054274 | US6291187 | US6323009 | US6344329 | US6368801 | US6939720 | US6977722 | US2010261292 | US7842246 | WO2015175856 | US10201812 | - GARDINER et al., Journal of Extracellular Vesicles, (20160000), vol. 5, no. 1, page 32945 | - HODGE et al., Front Biosci, (20060000), vol. 11, pages 788 - 803 | - BUGEON et al., Am JRespir Crit Care Med, (20000000), vol. 162, pages S164 - S168 | - BANER et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19980000), vol. 26, pages 5073 - 5078 | - LIZARDI et al., Nature Genetics, (19980000), vol. 19, page 226 | - SCHWEITZER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20000000), vol. 97, pages 10113 - 119 | - FARUQI et al., BMC Genomics, (20000000), vol. 2, page 4 | - NALLUR et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (20010000), vol. 29, page e118 | - DEAN et al., Genome Res, (20010000), vol. 11, pages 1095 - 1099 | - SCHWEITZER et al., Nature Biotech, (20020000), vol. 20, pages 359 - 365 | - HEIN et al., Pharm Res, (20080000), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 2116 - 2230 | - WINZELER et al., Science, (19990000), vol. 285, pages 901 - 906 | - EASON et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci, (20040000), vol. 101, no. 30, pages 11046 - 11051 | - FREDRIKSSON et al., Nature Methods, (20070000), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 327 - 329 | - KIM et al., "EVpedia: an integrated database of high-throughput data for systemic analyses of extracellular vesicles", J Extracell Vesicles, (20130000), vol. 2, doi:10.3402/jev.v2i0.20384, pages 1 - 7, XP055096423 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3402/jev.v2i0.20384 | - MATHIVANAN SSIMPSON RJ, "ExoCarta: a compendium of exosomal proteins and RNA", Proteomics, (20090000), vol. 9, pages 4997 - 5000 | WO2015US30925 |