EP4229633 - ADAPTIVE BLOCK SWITCHING WITH DEEP NEURAL NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Cong San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 02 /
DAVIDSON, Grant A. San Francisco, California 94103 / US | 03 /
VINTON, Mark S. San Francisco, California 94103 / US | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Lind Edlund Kenamets Intellectual Property AB Kungsportsavenyn 25 411 36 Göteborg / SE | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 21798240.4 | 15.10.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021US55248 | Priority number, date | US202063092685P | 16.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063092685 P | EP20200206462 | 09.11.2020 Original published format: EP 20206462 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022082021 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4229633 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/032, G06N3/04, G10L19/022, G10L25/30 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
G10L19/032 (EP,US);
G10L19/022 (EP,US);
G06N3/063 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP);
G10L19/04 (US);
G10L25/30 (EP,US);
G06N3/044 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE BLOCKUMSCHALTUNG MIT TIEFEN NEURONALEN NETZEN | [2023/34] | English: | ADAPTIVE BLOCK SWITCHING WITH DEEP NEURAL NETWORKS | [2023/34] | French: | COMMUTATION DE BLOCS ADAPTATIVE AVEC RÉSEAUX DE NEURONES PROFONDS | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 05.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6226608 (FIELDER LOUIS DUNN [US], et al) [A] 1-14,16-21* figure 1 *; | [A]US2020111501 (SUNG JONGMO [KR], et al) [A] 1-14,16-21 * figure 1 *; | [A]US10629213 (RAFII ZAFAR [US], et al) [A] 1-14,16-21 * figure 3 * |