EP4222690 - EYEWEAR DISTORTION CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snap Inc. 3000 31st Street Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | [2024/31] |
Former [2023/32] | For all designated states SNAP, INC. 3000 31st Street Santa Monica CA 90405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAK, Eyal Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | 02 /
MELAMED, Guy Santa Monica, CA 90405 / US | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | IPLodge bv Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 21798514.2 | 22.09.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021US51454 | Priority number, date | US202017039334 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: US202017039334 | [2023/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022072191 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4222690 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T11/40, G06T3/00, G06T3/40, H04N1/62 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04N1/62 (EP);
G06T5/80 (KR,US);
G06T11/00 (US);
G06T11/40 (EP,KR);
G06T3/18 (EP,KR);
G06T3/40 (US);
G06T3/4046 (EP,KR);
G06T7/13 (KR,US);
G06V40/161 (KR,US);
G06T2207/10004 (KR);
G06T2207/10016 (KR,US);
G06T2207/20081 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | KORREKTUR DER BRILLENVERZERRUNG | [2023/32] | English: | EYEWEAR DISTORTION CORRECTION | [2023/32] | French: | CORRECTION DE DISTORSION DE LUNETTES | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 02.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]JP2008250407 (NIKON CORP); | [XAI]JP2015064768 (CANON MARKETING JAPAN INC, et al); | [XAI]JP2015118617 (BUFFALO INC); | [A]US2015379348 (WHRITENOR JAMES ANDREW [US], et al); | [XAI]US2019206028 (TSUJI YUKA [JP]); |