EP4146201 - TREATMENT OF PROLIFERATIVE DISEASES OF THE CNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aucentra Therapeutics Pty Ltd 43/7 Liberman Close Adelaide, SA 5000 / AU | [2024/36] |
Former [2023/11] | For all designated states Aucentra Therapeutics Pty Ltd C/- Bentleys Pty Ltd. Level 5 63 Pirie Street Adelaide SA 5000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Shudong Adelaide, South Australia 5000 / AU | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21799549.7 | 05.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021AU00036 | Priority number, date | AU20200901435 | 06.05.2020 Original published format: AU 2020901435 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021222967 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4146201 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/427, A61K31/506, C07D417/14, A61P35/00, A61K31/495, A61K45/06 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,AU,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,AU,US);
A61K31/4184 (AU,US);
A61K31/436 (AU);
A61K31/439 (US);
A61K31/4439 (AU,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,AU,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (AU);
A61K31/436, A61K2300/00 (AU);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (AU);
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (AU,EP); |
Former IPC [2023/11] | A61K31/427, A61K31/506, C07D417/14, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG PROLIFERATIVER ERKRANKUNGEN DES ZNS | [2023/11] | English: | TREATMENT OF PROLIFERATIVE DISEASES OF THE CNS | [2023/11] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES PROLIFÉRATIVES DU SNC | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2017020065 (UNIV SOUTH AUSTRALIA [AU]) [X] 1-15 * [0011]; [0065]-[0071]; [00213]; tables 1-2, 4 *; | [A] - Solomon Tadesse; Laychiluh Bantie; Khamis Tomusange; Mingfeng Yu; Saiful Islam; Nataliya Bykovska; Benjamin Noll; Ge Zhu; Peng Li; Frankie Lam; Malika Kumarasiri; Robert Milne; Shudong Wang, "Discovery and pharmacological characterization of a novel series of highly selective inhibitors of cyclin‐dependent kinases 4 and 6 as anticancer agents", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, Wiley-Blackwell, UK, UK , (20180508), vol. 175, no. 12, doi:10.1111/bph.13974, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 2399 - 2413, XP071172417 [A] 1-15 * Tables 1-2; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/bph.13974 | [A] - Tadesse Solomon, Yu Mingfeng, Mekonnen Laychiluh B., Lam Frankie, Islam Saiful, Tomusange Khamis, Rahaman Muhammed H., Noll Benjamin, Basnet Sunita K. C., Teo Theodosia, Albrecht Hugo, Milne Robert, Wang Shudong, "Highly Potent, Selective, and Orally Bioavailable 4-Thiazol- N -(pyridin-2-yl)pyrimidin-2-amine Cyclin-Dependent Kinases 4 and 6 Inhibitors as Anticancer Drug Candidates: Design, Synthesis, and Evaluation", Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US , (20170309), vol. 60, no. 5, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.6b01670, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1892 - 1915, XP055870680 [A] 1-15 * Abstract; scheme 3; tables 1, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.6b01670 | [A] - Cao Yingxiao, Li Xin, Kong Shiqi, Shang Shuling, Qi Yanhui, "CDK4/6 inhibition suppresses tumour growth and enhances the effect of temozolomide in glioma cells", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY PRESS CAROL DAVILA, BUCHAREST, RO, RO , (20200501), vol. 24, no. 9, doi:10.1111/jcmm.15156, ISSN 1582-1838, pages 5135 - 5145, XP055870678 [A] 1-15 * . Whole document; in particular: abstract; page 5139, col. 1, para. 3 - col. 2, para. 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jcmm.15156 | [A] - Bing Li, Hua He, Bang-Bao Tao, Zhen-Yu Zhao, Guo-Han Hu, Chun Luo, Ju-Xiang Chen, Xue-Hua Ding, Ping Sheng, Yan Dong, Ling Zhang, Yi-Cheng Lu, "Knockdown of CDK6 enhances glioma sensitivity to chemotherapy", Oncology Reports, Athens, (20120000), vol. 28, no. 3, doi:10.3892/or.2012.1884, ISSN 1021-335X, pages 909 - 914, XP009532085 [A] 1-15 * Whole document; in particular: abstract; figure 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/or.2012.1884 |