EP4148185 - FLOATING REINFORCED CONCRETE PLATFORM APPLICABLE TO THE MARINE WIND POWER SECTOR INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seaplace, S.L. c/ Bolivia, 5 Bajo 28016 Madrid / ES | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE GUZMÁN MONTÓN, Santiago 28016 Madrid / ES | 02 /
MOREU GAMAZO, Jaime 28016 Madrid / ES | 03 /
TERCEÑO HERNÁNDEZ, Mirian 28016 Madrid / ES | 04 /
LÓPEZ VIZCAYNO, Pedro 28016 Madrid / ES | 05 /
GARCÍA MEROÑO, Caridad 28016 Madrid / ES | 06 /
DELGADO FRANCO, Salvador 28016 Madrid / ES | 07 /
PÉREZ DÍAZ, Óscar 28016 Madrid / ES | 08 /
TABOADA GOSÁLVEZ, Alberto 28016 Madrid / ES | 09 /
NEGUERUELA IMAÑA, Alberto 28016 Madrid / ES | 10 /
GONZÁLEZ LÓPEZ, Daniel 28016 Madrid / ES | 11 /
MOREU MUNAIZ, Manuel 28016 Madrid / ES | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21799682.6 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021ES70300 | Priority number, date | ES20200030418 | 08.05.2020 Original published format: ES 202030418 | [2023/11] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021224525 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | ES | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4148185 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 11.11.2021 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | EP | 05.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E02D27/42, F03D13/25 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
B63B21/50 (EP,KR,US);
E02D27/425 (EP,ES,KR);
F03D13/22 (ES,US);
B63B5/14 (EP,KR,US);
E02D15/08 (EP,KR);
E02D27/50 (EP,KR);
E02D27/52 (EP,KR);
F03D13/20 (KR);
F03D13/25 (EP,KR,US);
B63B2035/442 (EP,KR,US);
F05B2240/93 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Extension states | ME | 25.11.2022 | Validation states | MA | 25.11.2022 | TN | 25.11.2022 | Title | German: | SCHWIMMENDE STAHLBETONPLATTFORM FÜR DIE MEERESWINDKRAFTINDUSTRIE | [2023/11] | English: | FLOATING REINFORCED CONCRETE PLATFORM APPLICABLE TO THE MARINE WIND POWER SECTOR INDUSTRY | [2023/11] | French: | PLATEFORME FLOTTANTE EN BÉTON ARMÉ APPLICABLE À L'INDUSTRIE DU SECTEUR DE L'ÉOLIEN MARIN | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2022 | Translation filed | 25.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 25.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012155967 (NAGURNY NICHOLAS J [US], et al); | [YA]WO2014013098 (UNIV CANTABRIA [ES], et al); | [YA]WO2019070140 (INST SUPERIOR TECNICO [PT]); | [A]CN110453711 (UNIV TIANJIN) | International search | [A]US2012155967 (NAGURNY NICHOLAS J [US], et al); | [A]GB2493023 (SWAY TURBINE AS [NO]); | [A]WO2014013098 (UNIV CANTABRIA [ES], et al); | [A]CN106638662 (UNIV TIANJIN); | [A]CN110397066 (UNIV TIANJIN); | [A]CN110453711 (UNIV TIANJIN) | by applicant | US3974789 | CN102358402 | EP2457818 | WO2013155521 | JP2014184863 | JP2017074947 | CN109941398 | US2019264656 |