EP4147022 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PREDICTING CONDUCTOR HEALTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lindsey Manufacturing Co. 760 N. George Ave. Azusa, CA 91702 / US | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLISS, Ryan Lindon, UT 84042 / US | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/11] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 21800826.6 | 04.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021US30730 | Priority number, date | US202063019649P | 04.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063019649 P | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021226142 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4147022 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01K13/00, G01R19/00, G01R31/28, H02J13/00, G01R27/02, G01R31/58 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G01R31/58 (EP);
G01M5/0041 (US);
G01K13/00 (EP);
G01M5/0025 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/11] | G01K13/00, G01R19/00, G01R31/28, H02J13/00, G01R27/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR VORHERSAGE DER LEITERGESUNDHEIT | [2023/11] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PREDICTING CONDUCTOR HEALTH | [2023/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE PRÉDICTION DE LA SANTÉ D'UN CONDUCTEUR | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 31.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7516051 (JOHNSON DOUGLAS E [US], et al); | [A]US2017227677 (GODARD BERTRAND [BE]); | [A]US2019235011 (PINNEY NATHAN DOUGLAS [US], et al); | [A]CN110442898 (JIANGMEN POWER SUPPLY BUREAU GUANGDONG POWER GRID CO, et al) | International search | [A]US2007200556 (ENGELHARDT JOHN [US]); | [A]US2008189061 (SCHOLTZ ERNST [US], et al); | [A]US2014180616 (AASERUDE ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2014177672 (DAVIS MURRAY W [US]); | [A]US2018316219 (BLISS RYAN [US], et al) |