EP4200377 - ADHESIVE FORMULATION FOR PRODUCING PRESSED MATERIAL MOLDED BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lignom Holding S.à r.l. Avenue de la Faiencerie 121 1511 Luxembourg / LU | [2024/26] |
Former [2023/26] | For all designated states Lignom Holding S.a.r.l. Avenue de la Faiencerie 121 1511 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKOWITSCH, Herbert 2340 Mödling / AT | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21801424.9 | 17.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021EP72779 | Priority number, date | AT20200050695 | 18.08.2020 Original published format: AT 506952020 | [2023/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022038109 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200377 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4200377 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09J163/00 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C09J163/00 (EP,AT);
C09J179/02 (AT)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFFFORMULIERUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PRESSSTOFF-FORMKÖRPERN | [2023/26] | English: | ADHESIVE FORMULATION FOR PRODUCING PRESSED MATERIAL MOLDED BODIES | [2023/26] | French: | FORMULATION D'ADHÉSIF POUR LA FABRICATION DE CORPS MOULÉS EN MATIÈRE À MOULER PAR COMPRESSION | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 17.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06172733 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [A]JP2004231814 (OSHIKA KK); |