EP4237292 - ROLLCAGE PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 27.04.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states George TFE SCP c/o Altiqa SAM Le Patio Palace 41 avenue Hector Otto 98000 Monaco / MC | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LLOYD, John George 98000 Monaco / MC | 02 /
STOREY, Piers Christian 06300 Nice / FR | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21801648.3 | 25.10.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021IB59844 | Priority number, date | EP20200020502 | 29.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20020502 | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022090906 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4237292 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/055, B60R21/13 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
B60R21/055 (EP,US);
B60R21/13 (EP,US);
B60R2021/137 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | ÜBERROLLKÄFIGSCHUTZ | [2023/36] | English: | ROLLCAGE PROTECTION | [2023/36] | French: | PROTECTION DE CAGE À ROULEAUX | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 20.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0919440 (ISE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0026]; figures 1, 2 *; | [XDY]US6126231 (SUZUKI NAOYUKI [JP], et al) [XD] 1,3,7,8 * figures 2, 6, 9; claim 1 * * column 19, line 21 - line 27; figure 12 * [Y] 15; | [AD]US2002121787 (TARAHOMI SASSAN [US], et al) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0064]; figure - *; | [AD]US2006208467 (KHOURI MICHEL G [US]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0022]; figure 3 *; | [YDA]US2008284206 (POTOCKI JOHN [US]) [YD] 15 * paragraph [0004]; figure 2 *[A] 1; | [AD]WO2015193795 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0048]; figure - * | by applicant | US6126231 | EP0919440 | US2002121787 | US2004241388 | US2006208467 | US2008284206 | WO2015193795 |