EP4225269 - GASTRO RETENTIVE DOSAGE FORMS COMPRISING DEUTETRABENAZINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Auspex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 400 Interpace Parkway Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSHI, Mayank Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 02 /
SHAH, Parag Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 03 /
PATTANAYEK, Soumen Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 04 /
PATEL, Divyang Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 05 /
PANDITA, Sandeep Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/33] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21802138.4 | 12.10.2021 | [2023/33] | WO2021US54511 | Priority number, date | US202063090546P | 12.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063090546 P | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022081532 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4225269 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/20, A61P25/14 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
A61K9/0065 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4745 (KR,US);
A61K47/32 (US);
A61K47/38 (US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/2054 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | GASTRORETENTIVE DARREICHUNGSFORMEN MIT DEUTETRABENAZIN | [2023/33] | English: | GASTRO RETENTIVE DOSAGE FORMS COMPRISING DEUTETRABENAZINE | [2023/33] | French: | FORMES GALÉNIQUES À RÉTENTION GASTRIQUE COMPRENANT DE LA DEUTÉTRABÉNAZINE | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 28.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2014030249 (DUFFIELD ANDREW JOHN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-78* claims 1-54 *; | [XY]US2017087147 (SOMMER ANDREAS [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * examples 5,9,15,24,29; claims 1,12 * [Y] 1-78 | by applicant | US8524733 | US9296739 | - TIMMERMANS, J.MOES, A.J., "How well do floating dosage forms float?", Int. J Pharm., (19900000), vol. 62, doi:10.1016/0378-5173(90)90234-U, pages 207 - 216, XP025544167 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(90)90234-U |