EP4226378 - METHODS, SYSTEMS AND DEVICES FOR PROCESSING SEQUENCE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bruker Spatial Biology, Inc. 40 Manning Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2024/32] |
Former [2023/33] | For all designated states Nanostring Technologies, Inc. 530 Fairview Avenue North, Suite 2000 Seattle, WA 98109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASKOVICH, Peter Seattle, Washington 98103 / US | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 21802495.8 | 08.10.2021 | [2023/33] | WO2021US54215 | Priority number, date | US202063089432P | 08.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063089432 P | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022076847 | Date: | 14.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4226378 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16B30/00, G16B50/00 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
G16B30/00 (EP,KR,US);
G16B50/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON SEQUENZDATEN | [2023/33] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS AND DEVICES FOR PROCESSING SEQUENCE DATA | [2023/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET DISPOSITIFS DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES DE SÉQUENCE | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 28.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - MARCEL MARTIN, "Cutadapt removes adapter sequences from high-throughput sequencing reads", EMBNET.JOURNAL, (20110802), vol. 17, doi:10.14806/ej.17.1.200, ISSN 1023-4152, page 10, XP055737194 [X] 1,15,29,36-38 * section "Algorithm"; section "Features" * [I] 1-38 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.14806/ej.17.1.200 | [X] - Anonymous, "Babraham Bioinformatics - Trim Galore!", (20200925), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20200925233805/https://www.bioinformatics.babraham.ac.uk/projects/trim_galore/, (20220124), XP055882969 [X] 1,15,29,36-38 * p. 1/6 to 2/6, bullet points reciting features * | [X] - STINUS LINDGREEN, "AdapterRemoval: easy cleaning of next-generation sequencing reads", BMC RESEARCH NOTES, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, GB, (20120702), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1756-0500-5-337, ISSN 1756-0500, page 337, XP021129876 [X] 1,15,29,36-38 * p. 4 of 7, left-hand column, last par.: "[...] one or two FASTQ files [...]";; figure 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1756-0500-5-337 | [I] - T. MAGOC ET AL, "FLASH: fast length adjustment of short reads to improve genome assemblies", BIOINFORMATICS, GB, (20110907), vol. 27, no. 21, doi:10.1093/bioinformatics/btr507, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 2957 - 2963, XP055332486 [I] 15 * abstract * * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btr507 | [A] - TOM SMITH ET AL, "UMI-tools: modeling sequencing errors in Unique Molecular Identifiers to improve quantification accuracy", GENOME RESEARCH, US, (20170118), vol. 27, no. 3, doi:10.1101/gr.209601.116, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 491 - 499, XP055517852 [A] 1-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.209601.116 | [A] - Ben Langmead ET AL, "Fast gapped-read alignment with Bowtie 2", Nature Methods, Vol.9 NO.4 | APRIL 2012, Nature Methods, doi:10.1038/nmeth.1923, (20120101), pages 357 - 360, URL: http://www.webpages.uidaho.edu/msettles/courses/bcb504Sp12/reading/nmeth.1923.pdf, (20130708), XP055070044 [A] 1-38 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1923 | by applicant | US2019249248 |