Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
15.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
15.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
24.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.07.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
14.07.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
14.07.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
19.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.04.2023 | Change - representative | |
28.04.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.04.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
28.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |