EP4151771 - STEEL SHEET FOR HOT STAMPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKIYAMA Yuji Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI Akinobu Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
HARANO Takayuki Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21803022.9 | 13.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021JP18158 | Priority number, date | JP20200084584 | 13.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020084584 | [2023/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021230309 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151771 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4151771 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/18, C21D1/673, C23C28/00, C23C2/26, C23C2/12, C22C38/12, C22C38/14, C22C38/06, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/22, C22C38/00, C22C38/26, C22C21/02, C22C19/03, C21D8/00, C21D8/02, C21D9/48, C21D8/04, C21D9/46 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
C23C28/32 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
B21D22/022 (US);
C21D1/18 (EP);
C21D1/673 (EP);
C21D8/005 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (EP);
C21D8/0257 (EP);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D8/0405 (EP);
C21D8/0457 (EP);
C21D8/0463 (EP);
C21D9/48 (EP);
C22C19/03 (EP);
C22C21/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/14 (EP);
C22C38/22 (EP);
C22C38/26 (EP);
C22C38/28 (EP);
C22C38/32 (EP);
C22C38/38 (EP);
C22C38/60 (US);
C23C2/12 (EP);
C23C2/26 (EP,US);
C23C28/321 (EP,US);
C23C28/345 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | C23C28/02, B32B15/01, B32B15/18, B32B15/20, C21D1/18, C21D9/00, C21D9/46, C22C21/02, C22C38/00, C22C38/60, C23C2/12, C23C2/26, C23C28/00, C25D5/30, C25D5/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAHLBLECH ZUM HEISSPRÄGEN | [2023/12] | English: | STEEL SHEET FOR HOT STAMPING | [2023/12] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER POUR ESTAMPAGE À CHAUD | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2022 | Translation filed | 25.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 06.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04246182 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [A]JPH0860326 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [A]US2013095345 (MAKI JUN [JP], et al); | [A]EP2695963 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH04246182 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [A]JPH0860326 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [A]JP2011152589 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]KR20150075682 (POSCO [KR]); | [A]WO2017182382 (SALZGITTER FLACHSTAHL GMBH [DE]); | [A]JP2017532442 ; | [A]JP2018513909 ; | [A]WO2019097440 (ARCELORMITTAL [LU]); | [A]EP3489386 (MUHR & BENDER KG [DE]); | [A]JP2019518136 ; | [A]JP2020509200 | by applicant | WO2016016707 | WO2017187255 | JP2020084584 |